Brokerage for the sale of a wide range of goods
Possible affiliates
Denumire | Administratori | Statut/ Adresa | |
---|---|---|---|
Administrator |
1996-11-05 - 2015-07-20
Edineţ, Hlinaia |
||
Administrator |
1994-03-25 - 2015-11-02
Edineţ, str. Lazo S., 139 |
||
Administrator |
1998-02-24 - 2020-02-17
mun. Chişinău, Vatra, str. Pruncul Ion, 2 |
||
2008-01-09 - 2010-05-18
Ocniţa, Bîrnova |
|||
Administrator |
1993-02-05 - 2015-05-26
Hînceşti, Căţeleni |
||
Administrator |
1998-02-17 - 2020-02-17
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Alba-Iulia, 4, ap.(of.) 39 |
||
Administrator |
1996-10-22 - 2015-01-29
Orhei, Step-Soci |
||
Administrator |
1996-06-27 - 2015-02-09
Orhei, Step-Soci, str. Tineretului, 130 |
||
Administrator |
1995-03-06 - 2015-02-09
Orhei, str. Lupu Vasile, 114/4 |
||
Administrator |
1994-12-30 - 2015-02-11
Orhei, str. Eminescu Mihai, 13/12 |
||
Administrator |
1995-11-01 - 2015-02-11
Orhei, str. Bălcescu N., 23 |
||
Administrator |
1994-04-25 - 2015-02-12
Orhei, str. Iachir I., 53, ap.(of.) 7 |
||
Administrator |
1994-09-03 - 2015-02-13
Orhei, Bolohan |
||
Administrator |
1998-02-09 - 2015-02-20
Orhei, str. Dimo N., 2 |
||
Administrator |
1995-02-15 - 2015-02-24
Orhei, Mana |
||
Administrator |
1995-04-04 - 2015-02-26
Orhei, Pohrebeni |
||
Administrator |
2001-02-26 - 2015-02-25
Orhei, Pelivan |
||
Administrator |
1995-01-24 - 2015-03-03
Orhei, str. Iachir I., 53, ap.(of.) 52 |
||
Administrator |
1994-07-01 - 2015-03-09
Orhei, str. Barbu Lăutaru, 29 |
||
Administrator |
1998-01-23 - 2015-09-22
Şoldăneşti, Cotiujenii Mari |
||
Administrator |
1993-05-14 - 2015-06-16
Căuşeni, Taraclia |
||
Administrator |
1995-03-06 - 2019-01-03
Edineţ, str. Eminescu Mihai, 14/1, ap.(of.) A |
||
Administrator |
1994-08-03 - 2015-11-30
Ştefan Vodă, Răscăieţi, str. Diviziei 353 |
||
Administrator |
1994-10-31 - 2015-08-24
Ştefan Vodă, str. Libertăţii, 2, ap.(of.) 11 |
||
Administrator |
1993-06-21 - 2015-10-14
Ştefan Vodă, str. 31 August, 11/1, ap.(of.) 35 |
||
Administrator |
1995-12-28 - 2015-12-17
Căuşeni, str. Cantemir D., 34, ap.(of.) 26 |
||
Administrator |
1995-10-05 - 2016-03-23
Căuşeni, str. Mateevici A., 50, ap.(of.) 9 |
||
Administrator |
1994-10-19 - 2016-02-03
Ştefan Vodă, Olăneşti, str. Florilor, 13 |
||
Administrator |
1995-05-17 - 2015-03-18
Ungheni, str. Alecsandri Vasile, 26 |
||
Administrator |
1996-01-30 - 2015-02-25
Nisporeni, str. Viteazul Mihai, 48 |
||
Administrator |
2002-03-28 - 2015-02-12
Ungheni, Boghenii Noi |
||
Administrator |
1996-01-31 - 2015-03-10
Ungheni, str. Mitropolit Varlaam, 9 |
||
Administrator |
1993-12-03 - 2017-01-30
Nisporeni, str. Neaga Şt., 33 |
||
Administrator |
1995-09-08 - 2015-03-26
Nisporeni, str. Micle Veronica, 4 |
||
Administrator |
2001-02-01 - 2015-04-30
Ungheni, Pîrliţa |