Brokerage for the sale of a wide range of goods
Possible affiliates
Denumire | Administratori | Statut/ Adresa | |
---|---|---|---|
Administrator |
2023-01-04
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Albişoara, 40/1 |
||
Administrator |
2000-09-09 - 2013-02-05
Ungheni, str. Barbu Lăutaru, 12, ap.(of.) 77 |
||
Administrator |
1997-02-26 - 2013-02-07
Călăraşi, str. Alexandru cel Bun str-la 2, 6 |
||
Administrator |
2000-04-04 - 2013-04-25
Ungheni, Grozasca |
||
Administrator |
1997-10-15 - 2013-04-01
Ungheni, str. Neculce Ion, 7 |
||
Administrator |
1995-05-23 - 2013-05-02
Nisporeni, Vărzăreşti |
||
Administrator |
1994-09-29 - 2013-05-08
Ungheni, str. Crestiuc Ghenadie, 9, ap.(of.) 91 |
||
Administrator |
1994-03-22 - 2013-05-20
Nisporeni, str. Cantemir D., 24 |
||
Administrator |
1995-11-13 - 2013-08-02
Ungheni, str. Micle Veronica, 2, ap.(of.) 11 |
||
Administrator |
1992-12-28 - 2013-08-29
Ungheni, str. Haiducilor, 27 |
||
Administrator |
1997-02-12 - 2013-10-18
Ungheni, Mirceşti |
||
Administrator |
2000-08-17 - 2017-03-28
Ungheni, Grozasca |
||
Administrator |
1995-02-08 - 2013-12-05
Ungheni, str. Crestiuc Ghenadie, 7/1, ap.(of.) 86 |
||
Administrator |
1994-11-15 - 2013-12-10
Ungheni, Valea Mare |
||
Administrator |
1995-02-17 - 2013-12-12
Ungheni, Valea Mare |
||
Administrator |
1995-11-13 - 2013-12-19
Ungheni, str. Creangă Ion, 5, ap.(of.) 65 |
||
Administrator |
1993-12-17 - 2013-12-16
Ungheni, Sculeni |
||
Administrator |
1994-12-05 - 2014-01-15
Străşeni, str. Ştefan cel Mare, 65/3, ap.(of.) 30 |
||
Administrator |
1998-01-13 - 2016-05-26
Criuleni, Porumbeni |
||
Administrator |
2014-01-22 - 2017-01-03
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Mesager, 7 |
||
Administrator |
2014-01-23 - 2014-07-28
Străşeni, Bucovăţ, str. Alecsandri Vasile, 101 |
||
Lichidator Administrator Administrator Administrator |
2014-02-03 - 2015-03-30
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Mitropolit Dosoftei, 126, ap.(of.) 28 |
||
Administrator |
2014-02-20 - 2016-02-04
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Columna, 170 |
||
Administrator |
2014-02-27 - 2015-11-09
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Studenţilor str-la, 17/2, ap.(of.) 25 |
||
Administrator |
2014-03-07 - 2016-09-06
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Academician Sergiu Rădăuţanu, 9, ap.(of.) 45 |
||
Administrator |
2014-03-21 - 2016-10-03
mun. Chişinău, sec. Centru, str. Alecsandri Vasile, 99, ap.(of.) 19 |
||
Administrator |
2014-03-24 - 2015-07-10
Criuleni, str. Ştefan cel Mare, 54, ap.(of.) 42 |
||
Administrator |
1997-08-28 - 2017-01-02
Bender, str. Lenin, 31, ap.(of.) 1 |
||
Administrator |
1994-05-18 - 2014-04-03
Anenii Noi, Cobusca Nouă |
||
Administrator |
2014-04-16 - 2017-03-14
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Ureche Gr., 70 |
||
Administrator |
1996-07-31 - 2014-04-23
Străşeni, str. Cartierul locativ 1, 3, ap.(of.) 9 |
||
Administrator |
2004-11-01 - 2020-11-25
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Alba-Iulia, 2, ap.(of.) 23 |
||
Lichidator Administrator Administrator |
2014-04-30 - 2016-06-15
Ialoveni, str. Brăila, 96 |
||
Administrator |
2014-05-06 - 2016-09-05
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Grenoble, 257, ap.(of.) 208 |
||
Administrator |
1994-12-12 - 2014-05-13
Criuleni, str. 31 August 1989, 88 |