Brokerage for the sale of a wide range of goods
Possible affiliates
Denumire | Administratori | Statut/ Adresa | |
---|---|---|---|
Administrator |
2012-10-08 - 2017-03-24
mun. Chişinău, sec. Ciocana, str. Milescu-Spătarul Nicolae, 19/3, ap.(of.) 20 |
||
Administrator |
2012-11-09 - 2016-05-03
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Banatului, 103 |
||
Administrator |
1993-02-08 - 2013-12-23
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Bănulescu-Bodoni Gavril, 57, ap.(of.) 6 |
||
Administrator |
1995-02-16 - 2013-09-30
mun. Chişinău, sec. Centru, str. Negruzzi Constantin bd., 7, ap.(of.) 106 |
||
Administrator |
2012-12-13 - 2015-05-20
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Vieru Grigore bd., 22/1 |
||
Administrator |
2012-12-26
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Cuza-Vodă bd., 21/1, ap.(of.) 12 |
||
Administrator |
2012-01-27 - 2016-09-05
Bălţi, str. Şevcenko T., 89, ap.(of.) 39 |
||
Administrator |
2012-05-28 - 2015-09-29
Bălţi, str. Suceava, 8, ap.(of.) 1 |
||
Administrator |
1999-06-08 - 2020-11-25
Donduşeni, Tîrnova |
||
Administrator |
2007-11-28 - 2020-11-25
Briceni, Trebisăuţi |
||
Administrator |
2012-07-17 - 2015-10-01
Cantemir, Ciobalaccia |
||
Administrator |
2000-06-30 - 2019-01-02
mun. Chişinău, Bubuieci, str. Gagarin Iu., 16 |
||
Administrator |
1993-09-22 - 2013-09-23
Cimişlia, str. Decebal, 52 |
||
Administrator |
1994-04-20 - 2017-03-16
Leova, Borogani |
||
Administrator |
1992-11-04 - 2013-09-20
Cimişlia, Gradişte, str. Creangă Ion, 48 |
||
Administrator |
1997-08-13 - 2016-03-15
Orhei, Ivancea |
||
Administrator |
1996-08-08 - 2020-11-25
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Costin Miron, 18, ap.(of.) 88 |
||
Administrator |
2012-01-26 - 2014-01-23
Floreşti, str. Frunze M., 29 |
||
Administrator |
2012-02-27 - 2013-02-25
Floreşti, str. Dacia, 34, ap.(of.) 32 |
||
Administrator |
2012-03-27 - 2014-06-27
Soroca, Bădiceni |
||
Administrator |
2012-05-08 - 2017-03-23
Drochia, str. Gudanov Evghenii, 13/A, ap.(of.) 510 |
||
Administrator |
2012-05-24 - 2014-06-18
Soroca, Voloviţa |
||
Administrator |
2012-05-28 - 2014-03-31
Drochia, Şuri |
||
Administrator |
2012-06-01 - 2017-04-13
Soroca, str. Stroescu V., 53/A |
||
Administrator |
2012-09-10 - 2014-02-14
Soroca, str. Mateevici A., 16, ap.(of.) 36A |
||
Administrator |
2012-09-19 - 2017-03-06
Soroca, str. Alexandru cel Bun, 68, ap.(of.) 2 |
||
Administrator |
2012-11-06 - 2014-01-21
Soroca, str. Costin Miron, 5, ap.(of.) 44 |
||
Administrator |
2012-11-15 - 2013-08-21
Drochia, Palanca |
||
Administrator |
1994-02-09 - 2013-01-22
Soroca, Tătărăuca Veche |
||
Administrator |
1992-10-23 - 2013-01-22
Soroca, str. Luceafărul, 22, ap.(of.) 50 |
||
Administrator |
2012-06-12 - 2015-09-18
Căuşeni, Căinari, str. Alexandru cel Bun, 1, ap.(of.) 6 |
||
Administrator |
1995-03-22 - 2014-02-27
Căuşeni, str. Cantemir D., 2, ap.(of.) 16 |
||
Administrator |
1995-05-24 - 2016-01-22
Ungheni, str. Ştefan cel Mare, 213 |
||
Administrator |
2013-04-19
mun. Chişinău, sec. Centru, str. Tolstoi L., 72, ap.(of.) 14 |
||
Administrator |
1995-06-29 - 2020-02-17
Cahul, str. 31 August, 23, ap.(of.) 21 |