Brokerage for the sale of a wide range of goods
Possible affiliates
Denumire | Administratori | Statut/ Adresa | |
---|---|---|---|
Administrator |
2011-12-19 - 2017-04-03
Edineţ, Terebna |
||
Administrator |
1993-11-26 - 2018-12-31
Edineţ, Bădragii Vechi |
||
Administrator |
2011-09-12 - 2013-04-30
Leova, str. Basarab Matei, 15 |
||
Administrator Lichidator |
1992-06-12
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Columna, 72 |
||
Administrator |
2011-05-06 - 2016-04-07
Orhei, Jeloboc |
||
Administrator |
2011-06-02 - 2014-12-17
Orhei, Step-Soci |
||
Administrator |
1996-11-11 - 2013-04-04
Orhei, Mitoc |
||
Administrator |
2011-06-22 - 2017-02-01
Teleneşti, Scorţeni |
||
Administrator |
2011-07-05 - 2014-09-23
Orhei, Mitoc |
||
Administrator |
2011-02-04 - 2013-04-19
Drochia, Miciurin |
||
Administrator |
2011-02-28 - 2015-11-13
Soroca, Racovăţ |
||
Administrator |
2011-02-23 - 2013-04-25
Soroca, str. Viilor, 11, ap.(of.) 35 |
||
Administrator |
2011-02-25 - 2013-02-21
Drochia, str. Miciurin, 58B |
||
Administrator |
2011-02-25 - 2014-10-23
Drochia, Pelinia |
||
Administrator |
1995-08-01 - 2014-06-17
Drochia, str. Sorocii şos., 2, ap.(of.) 4 |
||
Administrator |
1997-09-23 - 2013-08-20
Soroca, str. Ştefan cel Mare, 28/3 |
||
Administrator |
2011-09-09 - 2013-08-01
Soroca, str. Budde Feofania, 26 |
||
Lichidator Administrator |
2013-07-24 - 2021-02-02
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Kiev, 16/1 |
||
Administrator |
2011-11-29 - 2017-03-22
Floreşti, str. Primăverii, 9 |
||
Administrator |
2011-11-29 - 2013-07-11
Floreşti, str. Damian L., 36 |
||
Administrator |
2011-03-02 - 2015-08-26
Căuşeni, str. Ştefan cel Mare şi Sfînt str-la 5, 2 |
||
Administrator |
1996-01-30 - 2018-12-31
Drochia, str. Sorocii şos., 20, ap.(of.) 24 |
||
Administrator |
2007-09-10 - 2018-12-31
Drochia, Chetrosu |
||
Administrator |
2001-04-04 - 2014-03-07
Ungheni, str. Lupu Vasile, 1, ap.(of.) 65 |
||
Administrator |
1995-03-22 - 2017-03-20
Ungheni, str. Creangă Ion, 17, ap.(of.) 97 |
||
Administrator |
2012-01-18 - 2015-09-24
mun. Chişinău, sec. Ciocana, str. Profesor Ion Dumeniuk, 22, ap.(of.) 48 |
||
Administrator |
2012-02-10 - 2015-09-28
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Munceşti şos., 240/3, ap.(of.) 60 |
||
Administrator |
2012-02-20 - 2013-02-05
Anenii Noi, Ţînţăreni, str. Creangă Ion, 10 |
||
Administrator |
2012-04-09
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Valea Crucii, 24, ap.(of.) 16 |
||
Administrator |
2012-05-15 - 2016-08-12
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Dacia bd., 14, ap.(of.) 57 |
||
Administrator Lichidator |
2012-05-16 - 2016-09-22
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Zelinski N., 36/1 |
||
Administrator Lichidator |
2012-06-04 - 2014-06-04
mun. Chişinău, Ciorescu, str. Moldova, 12, ap.(of.) 15 |
||
Administrator |
2012-08-01 - 2016-05-13
mun. Chişinău, sec. Centru, str. Valea Dicescu, 57 |
||
Administrator |
2012-08-10 - 2016-04-18
Străşeni, str. Cartierul locativ 1, 9, ap.(of.) 11 |
||
Administrator |
2012-08-20 - 2015-07-21
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Costin Miron, 13/2, ap.(of.) 57 |