Brokerage for the sale of a wide range of goods
Possible affiliates
Denumire | Administratori | Statut/ Adresa | |
---|---|---|---|
Administrator |
2007-05-21 - 2016-11-17
Soroca, Ţepilova |
||
Administrator |
2007-05-31 - 2016-03-24
Drochia, Zguriţa |
||
Administrator |
2007-06-28 - 2013-04-08
Floreşti, Ţipordei |
||
Administrator |
2007-07-03 - 2013-02-11
Floreşti, Gura Camencii |
||
Administrator |
2007-06-28 - 2013-02-04
Floreşti, str. Costin Miron, 12, ap.(of.) 19 |
||
Administrator |
2007-06-28 - 2017-03-17
Soroca, str. Arbore Z., 10 |
||
Administrator |
2007-07-13 - 2016-12-21
Drochia, Ţarigrad |
||
Administrator |
2007-08-02 - 2015-05-06
Drochia, Gribova |
||
Administrator |
2007-08-14 - 2016-10-31
Floreşti, Coşerniţa |
||
Administrator |
2007-08-17 - 2016-03-30
Drochia, str. Costin Miron, 8 |
||
Administrator |
2007-09-18 - 2013-07-26
Floreşti, Iliciovca |
||
Administrator |
2007-10-09 - 2017-01-18
Soroca, Visoca |
||
Administrator |
2007-11-27 - 2016-10-25
Floreşti, Vărvăreuca |
||
Administrator |
2007-11-29 - 2016-08-03
Drochia, str. Tobultoc Nicolae str-la, 14/1 |
||
Administrator |
2007-12-17 - 2016-10-12
Floreşti, str. Lupu Vasile, 9/2 |
||
Administrator |
2007-12-19 - 2016-09-15
Soroca, str. Cantemir D., 3, ap.(of.) 15 |
||
1996-01-23 - 2010-04-26
Cahul, str. Ştefan cel Mare, 38, ap.(of.) 32 |
|||
1995-11-14 - 2010-04-22
Cahul, str. Ştefan cel Mare, 75 |
|||
Administrator |
1997-02-19
Nisporeni, str. Suveranităţii, 15, ap.(of.) 20 |
||
Administrator |
2007-04-18
Ungheni, Corneşti, str. Russo Alecu, 6, ap.(of.) 19 |
||
Administrator |
2007-09-10 - 2016-06-10
Nisporeni, Brătuleni |
||
Administrator |
2006-03-20 - 2006-10-18
mun. Chişinău, sec. Centru, str. Hânceşti şos., 60/1 |
||
Administrator |
2007-12-21
Ungheni, str. Naţională, 43, ap.(of.) 62 |
||
Administrator |
1995-03-03 - 2013-08-05
UTA Găgăuzia, Vulcăneşti, str. XXVI Siezd, 30 |
||
Administrator |
1995-03-03 - 2016-04-27
UTA Găgăuzia, Vulcăneşti, str. Cikalov V., 13 |
||
Administrator |
1993-03-31 - 2015-08-25
Ialoveni, Horodca |
||
Administrator |
1993-03-22 - 2017-03-31
Ialoveni, str. Basarabia, 1/1, ap.(of.) 13 |
||
Administrator |
1995-05-11 - 2015-01-23
mun. Chişinău, Sîngera, str. 31 August, 46 |
||
1995-01-09 - 2010-04-28
Cahul, str. Stroescu V., 48, ap.(of.) 3 |
|||
Administrator |
2008-02-29 - 2014-05-27
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Albişoara, 80/2, ap.(of.) 23 |
||
Administrator |
1997-11-25 - 2013-05-07
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Zelinski N., 32/6, ap.(of.) 47 |
||
Administrator |
1997-04-08
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Dimo Nicolae, 11/1, ap.(of.) 44 |
||
Administrator |
1995-02-15 - 2018-12-28
Edineţ, str. Gagarin Iu., 44 |
||
1995-09-22 - 2010-04-29
Bălţi, str. Mareşalului Malinovski, 3, ap.(of.) 25 |
|||
1997-02-13 - 2010-05-03
Orhei, str. Nistreană, 22, ap.(of.) 11 |