Brokerage for the sale of a wide range of goods
Possible affiliates
Denumire | Administratori | Statut/ Adresa | |
---|---|---|---|
Administrator |
1997-03-20 - 2009-04-10
Taraclia, Tvardiţa, str. Gagarin Iu., 33, ap.(of.) 7 |
||
Administrator |
1993-11-16 - 2024-04-01
Donduşeni, Rediul Mare |
||
Administrator |
1993-02-03 - 2018-01-23
Edineţ, str. Gagarin Iu., 11 |
||
Administrator Lichidator |
1993-11-15 - 2007-11-05
UTA Găgăuzia, Ceadîr-Lunga, str. Gogol, 8 |
||
Administrator |
2007-01-04
Edineţ, str. Rareş Petru, 34 |
||
Administrator |
1993-12-22 - 2009-04-09
Cahul, str. Ştefan cel Mare, 17, ap.(of.) 24 |
||
Administrator |
1993-08-25 - 2016-01-15
Sîngerei, Heciul Nou |
||
Administrator |
2013-06-12
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Cuza-Vodă bd., 44 |
||
Administrator |
1996-08-29 - 2008-06-10
Edineţ, str. Pirogov N., 31 |
||
Lichidator Administrator |
1993-05-11 - 2007-12-21
Ocniţa, Mereşeuca |
||
Administrator |
1994-03-01 - 2006-12-19
Donduşeni, Cernoleuca |
||
Administrator |
1992-05-20 - 2008-09-12
Donduşeni, str. Eminescu Mihai, 26/5 |
||
Administrator |
1995-04-05 - 2007-06-22
Donduşeni, str. Independenţei, 4, ap.(of.) 46 |
||
Administrator |
1993-02-24 - 2010-12-28
Hînceşti, str. Hîncu Mihalcea, 241/A, ap.(of.) 3 |
||
Administrator Administrator Lichidator |
2001-06-06
UTA Găgăuzia, Comrat, str. Lenin, 7 |
||
Administrator |
2014-10-23
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Mitropolit Dosoftei, 100, ap.(of.) 83 |
||
Administrator |
1993-05-12
mun. Chişinău, sec. Centru, str. Eminescu M. bd., 56, ap.(of.) 16 |
||
Administrator |
1995-01-09 - 2006-07-22
Leova, Băiuş |
||
Administrator Lichidator |
2003-01-10 - 2016-11-25
Cantemir, Goteşti |
||
Administrator |
2005-03-02
Ialoveni, Moleşti |
||
Administrator |
1993-06-08 - 2006-02-14
Cimişlia, str. Alecsandri Vasile, 82 |
||
Administrator |
1996-11-22
Nisporeni, str. Micle Veronica, 6 |
||
Administrator |
1995-09-22 - 2024-07-01
Cimişlia, str. Stamati C., 2, ap.(of.) 17 |
||
Administrator |
1995-09-20 - 2016-12-19
Cantemir, str. Gagarin Iu., 5, ap.(of.) 38 |
||
Administrator |
2006-02-02 - 2017-07-13
Călăraşi, Temeleuţi |
||
Administrator |
1993-06-01 - 2006-02-15
Cimişlia, str. Alecsandri Vasile, 99, ap.(of.) 12 |
||
Întreprinderea Individuală GUŢU I. Lichidator Administrator |
1999-12-02 - 2012-01-23
Cimişlia, Ialpug |
||
Administrator Lichidator |
1996-07-29 - 2018-11-19
Ialoveni, str. Alexandru cel Bun, 78/1 |
||
Administrator |
1996-01-17 - 2007-03-17
Basarabeasca, Abaclia |
||
Lichidator Administrator |
1996-10-15 - 2013-04-08
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Pandurilor, 62, ap.(of.) 82 |
||
Administrator |
1995-03-30
Hînceşti, str. Milescu-Spătarul Nicolae, 35 |
||
Administrator |
1995-07-27 - 2014-11-21
Căuşeni, str. Eminescu Mihai, 27, ap.(of.) 27 |
||
Administrator |
1995-01-10 - 2006-11-27
Cimişlia, str. Alexandru cel Bun, 68 |
||
Administrator |
1995-07-21
Leova, str. Mitropolit Dosoftei, 16 |
||
Lichidator Administrator |
1995-04-10 - 2006-11-14
Hînceşti, Stolniceni |