Brokerage for the sale of a wide range of goods
Possible affiliates
Denumire | Administratori | Statut/ Adresa | |
---|---|---|---|
Administrator |
1996-01-15 - 2017-06-05
UTA Găgăuzia, Comrat, str. Tretiacova, 1 |
||
Administrator |
2006-10-05
Floreşti, Vărvăreuca |
||
Administrator |
1999-06-18 - 2006-10-09
Soroca, Bulboci |
||
Administrator |
2006-10-10
Drochia, str. Ghica-Vodă, 7/1 |
||
Administrator |
2006-10-11
Floreşti, Temeleuţi |
||
Administrator |
1997-02-27 - 2020-09-11
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Traian bd., 16/2, ap.(of.) 1 |
||
Administrator |
1994-02-03 - 2011-03-10
Drochia, Ţarigrad |
||
Administrator |
2006-10-23 - 2011-05-16
Soroca, str. Mateevici A., 16, ap.(of.) 49 |
||
Administrator |
2006-10-18 - 2009-07-30
Soroca, Vărăncău |
||
Administrator |
1996-10-08 - 2010-07-28
Soroca, str. Livezilor, 14/a |
||
Administrator |
1996-02-29 - 2010-10-30
Soroca, str. Junilor, 15 |
||
Administrator |
1993-02-23 - 2007-05-07
Soroca, str. Limba Română, 3, ap.(of.) 8 |
||
Administrator |
1994-11-08 - 2007-05-07
Soroca, str. Lupan Andrei, 16 |
||
Lichidator Administrator |
1993-10-26 - 2007-05-07
Soroca, str. Ştefan cel Mare, 119, ap.(of.) 49 |
||
Administrator |
2006-11-01 - 2023-09-29
Floreşti, str. Ştefan cel Mare, 11 |
||
Administrator |
1992-09-23 - 2005-01-24
Floreşti, str. Costin Miron, 26/A |
||
Administrator |
2006-11-16
mun. Chişinău, sec. Centru, str. Armenească, 4, ap.(of.) 3 |
||
Administrator |
1996-03-27 - 2022-05-13
Drochia, str. Independenţei, 81, ap.(of.) 85 |
||
Administrator |
2006-11-08
Drochia, str. Lupu Vasile, 3, ap.(of.) 20 |
||
Administrator |
1994-01-19
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Dacia bd., 30/1, ap.(of.) 33 |
||
Lichidator |
2006-11-30
Floreşti, str. Mateevici A., 33, ap.(of.) 25 |
||
Administrator provizoriu Administrator |
2008-01-30 - 2016-12-26
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Bariera Sculeni, 9/A |
||
Administrator |
1994-01-21
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Alexandru cel Bun, 62 |
||
Administrator |
1992-12-15 - 2005-02-07
Soroca, str. Ştefan cel Mare, 113 |
||
Administrator |
1992-08-11 - 2005-01-10
Soroca, str. Oziornaia, 2 |
||
Administrator |
1995-03-10 - 2005-01-10
Soroca, str. Caştanilor, 23, ap.(of.) 30 |
||
Administrator |
1995-10-13 - 2005-01-10
Soroca, Egoreni |
||
Administrator |
1995-05-24 - 2005-01-10
Soroca, Zastînca |
||
Administrator |
1995-03-16 - 2005-01-10
Soroca, str. <, 1 |
||
Administrator |
1994-01-25
mun. Chişinău, sec. Centru, str. Armenească, 25, ap.(of.) 11 |
||
Administrator |
1995-08-11 - 2007-01-18
Soroca, str. Ştefan cel Mare, 121, ap.(of.) 30 |
||
Administrator |
1995-01-16 - 2007-01-18
Soroca, str. Stroescu V., 26 |
||
Administrator |
1996-08-29 - 2007-01-18
Soroca, Zastînca |
||
Administrator |
2006-12-05 - 2021-02-02
Soroca, str. Pravda, 12 |
||
Administrator |
1994-01-26
mun. Chişinău, sec. Centru, str. Ismail, 84, ap.(of.) 46 |