Intermediaries for the sale of agricultural raw materials, live animals, textile raw materials and semi-products
Possible affiliates
Denumire | Administratori | Statut/ Adresa | |
---|---|---|---|
Administrator |
1993-11-23 - 2013-10-16
Cimişlia, Ivanovca Nouă |
||
Administrator Lichidator |
2011-03-22 - 2017-11-08
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Lupu Vasile, 36, ap.(of.) 30 |
||
Administrator |
2003-05-07
Cantemir, Baimaclia, str. Eminescu Mihai, 45 |
||
Administrator |
1994-10-17 - 2000-07-31
Soroca, str. Limba Română, 19, ap.(of.) 13 |
||
Administrator |
2001-06-18
Hînceşti, Logăneşti |
||
Administrator |
1994-12-26 - 2002-07-10
Soroca, Rubleniţa |
||
Administrator |
2002-04-08 - 2008-11-20
Cantemir, Baimaclia |
||
Administrator |
2003-03-03 - 2020-11-12
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Ghibu Onisifor, 2/3, ap.(of.) 102 |
||
Administrator |
1995-02-03 - 2006-04-03
Briceni, Grimăncăuţi |
||
Administrator |
1994-03-30 - 2009-04-15
Briceni, Tabani |
||
Comisia Administrator Comisia Comisia |
1996-07-30
Briceni, Larga |
||
Administrator |
1994-10-20
Donduşeni, str. Vieru Igor, 4 |
||
Administrator |
1995-04-28 - 2006-09-04
Edineţ, str. Zadnipru P., 11, ap.(of.) 15 |
||
Administrator |
1994-05-05 - 2007-01-22
Donduşeni, str. Independenţei, 4, ap.(of.) 29 |
||
Administrator |
2000-03-27
Edineţ, str. Roşca Valentin, 169/a |
||
Administrator |
1993-02-05 - 2007-10-30
Edineţ, Bădragii Noi |
||
Administrator |
1994-11-09
Edineţ, str. Bucovinei, 11 |
||
Lichidator Administrator |
2011-05-18 - 2020-11-11
Ocniţa, str. 50 Ani ai Biruinţei, 24, ap.(of.) 2 |
||
Administrator |
2002-01-21 - 2009-10-05
Edineţ, Brătuşeni |
||
Administrator |
1993-02-05 - 2009-06-03
Edineţ, Hlinaia |
||
Administrator |
1997-04-29 - 2009-03-30
Edineţ, Volodeni |
||
Administrator |
1996-01-24
Briceni, str. Ştefan cel Mare, 78 |
||
Administrator |
1996-02-14
Briceni, str. Olimpică, 11 |
||
Administrator |
1996-11-29
Briceni, Larga |
||
Administrator |
1995-12-14
Briceni, str. Lermontov M., 44 |
||
Administrator |
1993-01-28 - 2020-04-17
UTA Găgăuzia, Comrat, str. Galaţan, 17 |
||
Administrator |
1998-12-09 - 2009-02-19
Donduşeni, str. Independenţei, 7/4 |
||
Administrator |
1994-11-16 - 2005-12-16
Ocniţa, Vălcineţ |
||
Administrator |
2003-07-11 - 2009-08-06
Donduşeni, Codrenii Noi |
||
Administrator |
1999-06-01 - 2008-03-18
Donduşeni, str. Independenţei, 2/2, ap.(of.) 1 |
||
Administrator |
1996-04-03 - 2009-11-27
Edineţ, str. Neculce Ion, 16, ap.(of.) 2 |
||
Administrator |
1999-02-08 - 2007-11-02
Drochia, Maramonovca |
||
Lichidator Administrator |
1997-02-19 - 2020-11-13
Taraclia, str. Mira, 10, ap.(of.) 40 |
||
Administrator |
1996-01-10 - 2007-06-06
Donduşeni, str. Sîrbu Elena, 7, ap.(of.) 12 |
||
Administrator |
1997-03-20
Donduşeni, Ţaul |