Intermediaries for the sale of agricultural raw materials, live animals, textile raw materials and semi-products
Possible affiliates
Denumire | Administratori | Statut/ Adresa | |
---|---|---|---|
Administrator |
1996-03-20
Ungheni, str. Barbu Lăutaru, 12, ap.(of.) 20 |
||
Administrator Lichidator |
2006-09-06 - 2021-05-14
Orhei, str. Nistreană, 19, ap.(of.) 1 |
||
Administrator |
1995-12-15 - 2023-01-20
Călăraşi, str. Biruinţei, 8, ap.(of.) 1 |
||
Administrator |
1997-07-21 - 2004-04-28
Rezina, Saharna Nouă |
||
Administrator Comitet Comitet |
1997-03-06
Orhei, Peresecina |
||
Administrator |
1996-11-11
Soroca, str. Ştefan cel Mare, 23 |
||
Administrator |
2009-09-16 - 2022-05-04
Ocniţa, Gîrbova |
||
Administrator |
1999-09-15 - 2004-06-08
Cahul, Tătăreşti |
||
Administrator |
2005-07-13 - 2024-05-10
Floreşti, str. Trandafirilor, 22, ap.(of.) 2 |
||
Administrator |
1996-09-17 - 2024-05-07
Floreşti, Năpadova |
||
Administrator |
1992-12-10 - 2024-07-02
Drochia, str. Plămădeală A., 21 |
||
Administrator |
1994-03-16 - 2021-05-26
UTA Găgăuzia, Vulcăneşti, str. Komsomolskaia, 34 |
||
Administrator |
1992-04-08 - 2021-06-02
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Russo Alecu, 18/1, ap.(of.) 25 |
||
Administrator Lichidator |
2014-05-27 - 2021-06-03
Sîngerei, Bilicenii Vechi |
||
Administrator |
2001-09-24 - 2021-06-03
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Vladimirescu Tudor, 7, ap.(of.) 51 |
||
Administrator |
2001-05-30 - 2021-06-03
Orhei, Peresecina |
||
Administrator Lichidator |
2015-02-05 - 2021-06-04
Ocniţa, str. 50 Ani ai Biruinţei, 20 |
||
Administrator |
1999-04-13 - 2021-06-08
Ungheni, Unţeşti |
||
Administrator |
1992-10-09 - 2021-06-08
Nisporeni, str. Dacia, 17 |
||
Administrator |
2002-08-16 - 2021-06-08
Nisporeni, Zberoaia |
||
Administrator |
1995-06-28 - 2021-06-08
Nisporeni, Cioreşti |
||
Administrator |
1995-11-06 - 2021-06-08
Nisporeni, Bălăureşti |
||
Administrator |
1994-11-10 - 2021-06-08
Nisporeni, str. Enescu George, 22 |
||
Administrator provizoriu Administrator |
1999-05-31 - 2021-06-08
Basarabeasca, Iordanovca |
||
Administrator |
2006-11-28 - 2021-06-10
Nisporeni, str. Suveranităţii, 13, ap.(of.) 25 |
||
Administrator |
2002-09-03
Teleneşti, Mîndreşti |
||
Administrator |
1993-10-20 - 2004-10-22
Hînceşti, Logăneşti |
||
Administrator |
1994-12-09 - 2021-06-15
Călăraşi, str. Lupu Vasile, 53 |
||
Administrator |
1999-05-07 - 2004-11-02
Cimişlia, Ecaterinovca |
||
Administrator |
2004-06-22 - 2021-06-16
Briceni, Berlinţi |
||
Administrator |
1996-02-16 - 2004-12-20
Basarabeasca, str. Chirpicinîi str-la, 26 |
||
Administrator |
1992-12-02 - 2004-12-10
Hînceşti, Cărpineni |
||
Administrator Lichidator |
2005-01-19
mun. Chişinău, sec. Centru, str. Kaczynski Lech, 2/4, ap.(of.) 48 |
||
Administrator |
1994-04-18 - 2023-12-29
Nisporeni, str. 1 Mai, 42 |
||
Administrator |
2003-10-20 - 2021-06-17
Edineţ, str. Şoseaua Bucovina, 37 |