Intermediaries for the sale of agricultural raw materials, live animals, textile raw materials and semi-products
Possible affiliates
Denumire | Administratori | Statut/ Adresa | |
---|---|---|---|
Administrator |
2002-11-01 - 2019-04-15
Ungheni, Floriţoaia Veche |
||
Administrator |
2002-12-05 - 2019-04-15
Ungheni, Corneşti |
||
Administrator |
2002-04-12 - 2019-07-12
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Dacia bd., 38/5, ap.(of.) 32 |
||
Administrator |
2012-05-10 - 2019-02-22
Drochia, str. Cantemir D., 115 |
||
Administrator Administrator al procesului de insolvabilitate |
2005-12-21 - 2021-11-26
mun. Chişinău, sec. Centru, str. Tighina, 37, ap.(of.) 7 |
||
Administrator |
1996-12-17 - 2019-02-26
Basarabeasca, Iserlia |
||
Administrator |
2003-08-28 - 2019-02-27
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Munceşti şos., 162, ap.(of.) 145 |
||
Administrator |
2001-07-27 - 2022-03-16
Basarabeasca, str. Ţăranilor, 6 |
||
Administrator |
1995-06-15 - 2022-03-16
Hînceşti, Caracui |
||
Administrator Lichidator |
1998-06-02 - 2019-03-01
Hînceşti, Lăpuşna |
||
1992-12-03 - 2010-09-22
Hînceşti, str. Lazo S., 15 |
|||
Lichidator Administrator |
2006-07-13
Bălţi, str. Tiraspol, 7, ap.(of.) 3 |
||
Administrator |
1998-01-20 - 2020-02-18
Făleşti, str. Ştefan cel Mare, 16, ap.(of.) 64 |
||
Administrator |
1997-10-14 - 2020-02-18
Făleşti, str. Ştefan cel Mare, 3, ap.(of.) 2 |
||
Lichidator Administrator |
2002-04-03 - 2019-03-06
Anenii Noi, Ţînţăreni |
||
Administrator |
1998-10-06 - 2019-06-13
Rîşcani, str. Independenţei, 57, ap.(of.) 51 |
||
Administrator |
1996-06-10 - 2017-03-20
Orhei, str. Susleni, 28 |
||
Administrator |
2006-11-10 - 2019-06-12
Cahul, str. Kogălniceanu Mihail, 2/G |
||
Administrator |
1993-02-17 - 2019-03-07
Edineţ, str. Bucovinei, 25, ap.(of.) 3 |
||
Administrator |
1995-09-13 - 2019-05-21
Briceni, Trebisăuţi |
||
Administrator |
1995-03-15 - 2019-05-22
Briceni, str. Uzinelor, 16, ap.(of.) 27 |
||
1997-04-24 - 2010-10-07
Edineţ, Brătuşeni, str. Gura Cotului, 69 |
|||
1995-12-12 - 2010-10-14
Cimişlia, Hîrtop |
|||
Administrator |
1997-10-21 - 2019-09-24
Drochia, Mîndîc |
||
Administrator |
1998-12-16 - 2019-03-12
Drochia, str. Russo Alecu, 34 |
||
Lichidator Administrator |
2004-04-17 - 2019-03-11
Orhei, Pelivan |
||
Administrator |
1996-10-03 - 2017-04-19
Călăraşi, Vălcineţ |
||
Administrator |
1992-04-28 - 2019-03-12
Bălţi, str. Damian Liviu, 43 |
||
Administrator |
1994-02-11 - 2019-03-11
Cimişlia, str. 27 August, 73 |
||
Administrator |
1992-10-05
Drochia, str. Hotin, 1 |
||
Lichidator Administrator |
2004-02-25 - 2019-03-13
Cantemir, Victorovca |
||
Administrator |
1992-09-25 - 2020-02-18
Nisporeni, str. Viilor, 146 |
||
Administrator |
2012-10-03 - 2019-09-24
Edineţ, Tîrnova |
||
Administrator |
1995-09-13 - 2018-04-05
Ungheni, str. Boico Alexandru, 7, ap.(of.) 15 |
||
Administrator |
2000-10-17 - 2016-10-21
Cahul, Baurci-Moldoveni |