Intermediaries for the sale of agricultural raw materials, live animals, textile raw materials and semi-products
Possible affiliates
Denumire | Administratori | Statut/ Adresa | |
---|---|---|---|
Administrator |
1994-06-06 - 2013-02-17
Leova, str. Sadoveanu M., 5 |
||
Administrator |
2005-05-26 - 2017-04-04
Briceni, Colicăuţi |
||
Administrator |
1993-06-22 - 2014-03-05
Leova, str. Mitropolit Dosoftei, 19 |
||
Administrator |
1994-08-19 - 2013-06-24
Hînceşti, str. Hâncu Iacob, 81 |
||
Administrator |
1995-06-13
Hînceşti, str. Kogălniceanu Mihail, 3 |
||
Administrator |
2005-02-17 - 2015-01-28
Teleneşti, str. Ţepeş Vlad, 6 |
||
Administrator |
2005-10-04 - 2013-03-27
Teleneşti, Suhuluceni |
||
Administrator |
1994-01-19 - 2016-01-21
Teleneşti, Tîrşiţei |
||
Administrator |
1996-11-19 - 2016-06-24
Floreşti, Temeleuţi |
||
Administrator |
2005-11-07 - 2015-05-11
Floreşti, str. Plămădeală A., 10 |
||
Administrator |
1997-07-10 - 2018-12-26
Drochia, Dominteni |
||
Administrator |
2005-09-08 - 2013-11-20
Călăraşi, Rădeni |
||
Lichidator Administrator |
2005-11-14 - 2014-06-03
Ungheni, str. Eminescu Mihai, 65, ap.(of.) 63 |
||
Administrator |
1995-02-20 - 2014-01-02
Ungheni, str. Ştefan cel Mare, 159, ap.(of.) 63 |
||
Administrator |
2004-03-04 - 2018-12-26
mun. Chişinău, sec. Centru, str. David Aurel, 9/1 |
||
Administrator |
2006-02-15 - 2016-04-04
Donduşeni, Rediul Mare |
||
Administrator |
2006-04-03 - 2014-12-02
Edineţ, Lopatnic |
||
Administrator |
2006-06-01 - 2016-06-30
Briceni, Lipcani, str. Livezilor, 3, ap.(of.) 9 |
||
Administrator |
1997-02-28 - 2013-05-24
Briceni, Larga |
||
Administrator |
1995-06-20 - 2014-01-13
Briceni, str. Uzinelor, 10, ap.(of.) 30 |
||
Administrator |
1995-11-23 - 2016-08-01
Orhei, Piatra |
||
Administrator |
1994-12-30 - 2015-08-26
Orhei, str. Eminescu M. bd., 15, ap.(of.) 11 |
||
Administrator |
1996-02-29 - 2014-05-15
Orhei, str. 31 August 1989, 152 |
||
Administrator |
2006-04-06 - 2016-06-03
Soroca, Vasilcău |
||
Administrator |
2001-08-08 - 2013-06-14
Drochia, Maramonovca |
||
Administrator |
2006-11-02 - 2013-09-17
Soroca, Bădiceni |
||
Administrator |
2007-01-24 - 2015-09-24
Floreşti, Bobuleşti |
||
Administrator |
1996-02-02 - 2016-03-09
Călăraşi, str. Ştefan cel Mare, 2, ap.(of.) 37 |
||
Administrator |
1995-11-29 - 2013-12-12
Ungheni, str. Crestiuc Ghenadie, 8, ap.(of.) 10 |
||
Administrator |
2007-09-26 - 2016-11-30
mun. Chişinău, sec. Ciocana, str. Vieru Igor, 14/1, ap.(of.) 142 |
||
1995-04-28 - 2010-04-08
Cimişlia, str. Alexandru cel Bun, 19 |
|||
Administrator |
2007-02-28 - 2013-08-30
Briceni, Lipcani, str. Independenţei, 88 |
||
Administrator |
2007-10-16 - 2015-01-06
Briceni, Caracuşenii Vechi |
||
Administrator |
2007-11-23 - 2013-10-01
Edineţ, str. Gribov N., 15 |
||
Administrator |
2007-10-23 - 2013-12-09
Hînceşti, Mereşeni |