Intermediaries for the sale of agricultural raw materials, live animals, textile raw materials and semi-products
Possible affiliates
Denumire | Administratori | Statut/ Adresa | |
---|---|---|---|
Lichidator |
1997-09-22 - 2014-12-20
Ungheni, str. Crestiuc Ghenadie, 5, ap.(of.) 15 |
||
Administrator |
2000-03-10 - 2017-09-12
Cahul, Andruşul de Sus |
||
Administrator |
1995-03-14 - 2017-07-28
Briceni, Şirăuţi |
||
Administrator |
1992-06-16 - 2017-03-31
Hînceşti, str. Zadnipru P., 6 |
||
Administrator |
1996-02-09 - 2017-04-04
Hînceşti, Dahnovici |
||
Administrator |
1996-06-07 - 2016-08-10
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Paris, 53/3, ap.(of.) 16 |
||
Administrator |
1996-02-29 - 2020-02-13
Donduşeni, str. Sîrbu Elena, 7, ap.(of.) 23 |
||
Administrator |
2003-05-26 - 2013-01-11
Soroca, Alexandru cel Bun |
||
Administrator |
1997-02-06 - 2013-01-17
Hînceşti, Cărpineni, str. Ştefan Vodă, 267 |
||
Administrator |
1996-02-23 - 2015-12-23
Briceni, str. Budionnîi, 12 |
||
Administrator |
1998-07-13 - 2016-04-21
Teleneşti, Ghiliceni |
||
Administrator |
1993-05-12 - 2013-01-22
Cimişlia, str. Cosmonauţilor, 13 |
||
Lichidator Administrator |
1995-03-20 - 2013-01-22
Basarabeasca, str. Kirov, 11 |
||
Administrator |
1996-07-12 - 2015-09-04
Edineţ, str. Lazo S., 3 |
||
Administrator |
1995-08-18 - 2013-01-24
Briceni, str. Eminescu Mihai, 75/20 |
||
Administrator |
2013-05-29 - 2013-10-16
Briceni, Corjeuţi |
||
Administrator |
2003-07-11 - 2013-09-06
Donduşeni, Tîrnova, str. 31 August, 89 |
||
Administrator |
2011-02-02 - 2021-03-11
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Vladimirescu Tudor, 8/1 |
||
Administrator |
2002-05-23 - 2016-12-06
Orhei, Piatra |
||
Administrator |
2003-01-27
Orhei, Zahoreni |
||
Administrator |
1994-10-18 - 2015-04-24
Orhei, Susleni, str. Ştefan cel Mare, 14 |
||
Administrator |
2003-03-14
Teleneşti, Ineşti |
||
Administrator |
1998-12-25 - 2014-12-17
Teleneşti, Chiţcanii Vechi |
||
Administrator |
1996-01-11 - 2013-07-18
Orhei, str. Prieteniei, 18 |
||
Administrator |
2002-05-15 - 2013-04-25
Teleneşti, Negureni |
||
Administrator |
2002-09-04 - 2013-07-17
Rezina, Ignăţei |
||
Administrator |
2000-07-07 - 2013-10-14
Soroca, str. Stroescu V., 75 |
||
Administrator |
1997-08-19 - 2015-07-08
Soroca, str. Traian, 17 |
||
Administrator |
1998-08-18 - 2013-02-19
Floreşti, str. Victoriei bd., 34 |
||
Administrator |
1995-12-27 - 2015-06-22
Soroca, str. Limba Română, 3, ap.(of.) 47 |
||
Administrator |
2013-03-12 - 2020-10-29
Briceni, Cotiujeni |
||
Administrator |
1992-11-12 - 2013-04-11
Drochia, str. Testemiţeanu N., 47 |
||
Administrator |
1994-03-22 - 2016-07-28
Floreşti, str. Asachi Gh., 28 |
||
Administrator |
2003-12-22 - 2014-01-15
Floreşti, str. Lupu Vasile, 61 |
||
Administrator |
1996-11-12 - 2016-11-29
Floreşti, Prajila |