Intermediaries for the sale of agricultural raw materials, live animals, textile raw materials and semi-products
Possible affiliates
Denumire | Administratori | Statut/ Adresa | |
---|---|---|---|
Administrator |
1997-05-30 - 2012-08-29
Nisporeni, str. Codru, 29 |
||
Administrator |
1993-10-18
Nisporeni, str. 1 Mai, 1 |
||
Administrator |
2009-01-20 - 2012-07-30
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Madan Gheorghe, 87/5, ap.(of.) 31 |
||
Administrator |
1995-02-27 - 2019-04-22
Basarabeasca, str. Şcolii, 16 |
||
Administrator |
1994-07-05 - 2012-08-04
Soroca, Rubleniţa |
||
Administrator |
2011-09-22 - 2012-12-05
Anenii Noi, Mereni |
||
Administrator |
2011-09-22 - 2012-11-30
Anenii Noi, Mereni |
||
Administrator |
2011-09-22 - 2012-11-30
Anenii Noi, Mereni |
||
Administrator |
1998-05-22 - 2012-12-24
Hînceşti, Sărata-Galbenă |
||
Administrator |
2011-06-01
Ungheni, Floriţoaia Veche |
||
Administrator |
1995-01-20 - 2012-08-23
Leova, Sărata Nouă |
||
Administrator |
1996-03-15 - 2012-10-25
Drochia, str. Burebista, 2.12 |
||
Administrator |
1993-05-27 - 2012-08-06
Drochia, Maramonovca |
||
Administrator |
1994-11-03 - 2012-08-06
Drochia, str. Jukovski, 6, ap.(of.) 5 |
||
Administrator |
1995-04-26 - 2012-08-04
Drochia, str. Sfatul Ţării, 30, ap.(of.) 9 |
||
Administrator |
1992-10-06 - 2012-08-04
Soroca, str. Ştefan cel Mare, 24 |
||
Administrator |
1995-12-01 - 2012-10-22
Drochia, str. Negruzzi C., 3 |
||
Administrator |
2012-05-15 - 2012-09-20
Drochia, Dominteni |
||
Administrator |
1995-04-13 - 2012-09-13
Soroca, str. Russo Alecu, 6, ap.(of.) 3 |
||
Administrator |
1992-12-02 - 2012-10-22
Drochia, str. Doina, 21, ap.(of.) 3 |
||
Administrator |
1993-12-14 - 2012-10-22
Drochia, str. Sorocii şos., 16, ap.(of.) 5 |
||
Administrator |
1994-04-18 - 2012-09-13
Drochia, str. 27 August, 28, ap.(of.) 2 |
||
Administrator |
1996-03-25 - 2012-08-29
Drochia, str. 27 August, 28, ap.(of.) 42 |
||
Administrator |
1995-07-04 - 2012-11-29
Drochia, Nicoreni |
||
Administrator |
1995-09-13 - 2012-12-18
Soroca, Tătărăuca Veche |
||
Administrator |
1999-03-23 - 2019-01-28
Străşeni, Recea |
||
Administrator |
1994-02-11 - 2012-12-26
Drochia, Nicoreni |
||
Administrator |
1996-10-09 - 2012-12-24
Nisporeni, str. 1 Mai, 37 |
||
Administrator |
1997-01-30 - 2019-02-04
Ocniţa, str. Budjacscaia, 6 |
||
Administrator |
1995-12-28 - 2019-01-23
Cimişlia, Mihailovca |
||
Administrator |
1997-12-18 - 2020-02-13
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Alba-Iulia, 1 |
||
Administrator |
1996-12-04 - 2018-03-02
Briceni, str. Budionnîi, 35 |
||
Administrator |
2002-09-17 - 2013-12-14
Hînceşti, str. Marinescu Al., 55 |
||
Administrator |
1995-08-09 - 2013-10-01
Cimişlia, str. Stamati C., 27 |
||
Administrator |
1995-10-02 - 2018-12-14
Leova, str. Ion Vodă, 20 |