Intermediaries for the sale of agricultural raw materials, live animals, textile raw materials and semi-products
Possible affiliates
Denumire | Administratori | Statut/ Adresa | |
---|---|---|---|
Administrator |
2007-09-19
Călăraşi, str. Bojole, 33, ap.(of.) 12 |
||
Administrator |
1996-07-24 - 2019-08-21
Edineţ, Cupcini, str. Eminescu Mihai, 43 |
||
Administrator |
1998-10-20 - 2018-06-25
Bălţi, str. Burebista, 20, ap.(of.) 22 |
||
Administrator Lichidator Lichidator Lichidator |
1994-12-26 - 2014-04-18
Soroca, str. Uzinelor, 2/4 |
||
Administrator |
2010-09-15 - 2020-10-26
mun. Chişinău, sec. Centru, str. Mitropolit Varlaam, 65, ap.(of.) 306 |
||
Administrator |
2003-01-27
Cimişlia, Valea Perjei |
||
Administrator |
1994-03-02 - 2019-02-13
Drochia, Chetrosu |
||
Administrator |
2013-04-10
Drochia, Popeştii de Jos |
||
Administrator |
2013-04-24
Drochia, Şuri |
||
Administrator |
2007-05-16
Orhei, str. Unirii, 40 |
||
Administrator |
1994-01-28 - 2006-06-06
Donduşeni, Codrenii Noi |
||
Administrator |
2000-01-11
Rezina, Cinişeuţi |
||
Administrator |
1995-01-24 - 2018-06-26
mun. Chişinău, sec. Centru, str. Ialoveni, 98/2, ap.(of.) 58 |
||
Administrator |
2003-08-06 - 2018-12-20
Orhei, Ivancea |
||
Administrator |
2010-08-26
Bălţi, str. Lesecico Mihail, 20, ap.(of.) 49 |
||
Administrator |
2002-03-28 - 2018-12-20
Briceni, str. Nucilor, 5 |
||
Administrator |
1994-04-01 - 2011-06-14
Soroca, Egoreni |
||
Administrator |
1997-02-07
Leova, Tochile-Răducani |
||
Administrator |
2010-02-16
Hînceşti, Drăguşeni |
||
Administrator |
2009-07-22
Soroca, str. Arhitector Voiţehovski, 7 |
||
Administrator |
1993-04-15 - 2019-08-23
Străşeni, Micleuşeni |
||
Administrator |
2013-01-31
Floreşti, str. Costin Miron, 38 |
||
Administrator |
2009-05-05
Cimişlia, Valea Perjei |
||
Administrator |
2006-04-06 - 2009-04-23
Teleneşti, Scorţeni |
||
Administrator |
2002-06-26 - 2009-02-20
Orhei, str. Iachir I., 21, ap.(of.) 22 |
||
Administrator |
2011-03-22
UTA Găgăuzia, Ceadîr-Lunga, str. Bugeacului, 241 |
||
Administrator |
1998-10-06 - 2024-08-29
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Costin Nicolae, 65/3, ap.(of.) 29 |
||
Administrator |
2009-10-28 - 2020-11-19
Floreşti, str. Porumbescu Ciprian, 2, ap.(of.) 21 |
||
Administrator |
2007-01-18 - 2016-05-11
Briceni, Colicăuţi |
||
Administrator |
2011-05-23 - 2020-11-19
Floreşti, Sîrbeşti |
||
Administrator Lichidator |
2011-07-08 - 2021-12-24
Orhei, Zahoreni |
||
Administrator |
2008-01-10
Cimişlia, Satul Nou |
||
Administrator |
2008-01-15 - 2017-08-16
Cimişlia, Bogdanovca Veche |
||
Administrator |
2008-01-28 - 2008-12-03
Basarabeasca, Abaclia |
||
Administrator |
1995-07-06 - 2016-05-16
Edineţ, Trinca |