Intermediaries for the sale of agricultural raw materials, live animals, textile raw materials and semi-products
Possible affiliates
Denumire | Administratori | Statut/ Adresa | |
---|---|---|---|
Administrator |
2001-06-25 - 2003-09-02
mun. Chişinău, sec. Centru, str. Kogălniceanu Mihail, 74, ap.(of.) 6 |
||
Administrator |
1998-06-24 - 2004-02-02
Anenii Noi, Ţînţăreni |
||
Administrator |
1998-06-29 - 2003-01-27
Anenii Noi, Ţînţăreni |
||
Administrator |
1992-08-07 - 2003-07-09
Bălţi, str. Miciurin, 7 |
||
Administrator |
1996-07-31 - 2005-11-10
Hînceşti, Sărata-Galbenă |
||
Administrator |
1999-04-06 - 2003-01-22
Teleneşti, Brînzenii Noi |
||
Administrator |
1995-03-18 - 2020-02-12
Făleşti, Ilenuţa |
||
Administrator |
2011-12-13 - 2018-12-19
Ocniţa, Clocuşna |
||
Administrator |
1996-08-14 - 2018-10-09
Nisporeni, str. Creangă Ion, 10 |
||
Administrator |
1993-01-21 - 2003-06-02
mun. Chişinău, sec. Centru, str. Columna, 144, ap.(of.) 5 |
||
Administrator |
1994-12-23 - 2002-12-24
Briceni, Corjeuţi |
||
Administrator |
1995-12-20
Cimişlia, Cenac |
||
Administrator |
1996-03-11
Nisporeni, Boldureşti |
||
Administrator |
2001-10-24 - 2003-03-26
Criuleni, Cimişeni |
||
Administrator |
1997-01-15 - 2003-06-18
Glodeni, str. Eminescu M. bd., 23 |
||
Administrator |
1996-03-11 - 2003-04-04
Briceni, Lipcani, str. Gogol, 7 |
||
Administrator |
1995-11-10 - 2003-04-07
Briceni, Trebisăuţi |
||
Administrator |
1995-03-10
Briceni, str. Independenţei, 9, ap.(of.) 12 |
||
Administrator |
1995-03-06 - 2003-04-03
Briceni, str. Ştefan cel Mare, 6, ap.(of.) 14 |
||
Administrator |
1996-04-09
Nisporeni, Grozeşti |
||
Administrator |
1994-09-30 - 2003-02-06
Briceni, Grimăncăuţi |
||
Administrator |
1995-02-24 - 2003-04-22
Briceni, str. Uzinelor, 6, ap.(of.) 404 |
||
Administrator |
1994-11-25 - 2003-06-12
Briceni, str. Libertăţii, 4 |
||
Administrator |
1996-08-16 - 2003-05-15
Briceni, str. 31 August, 1, ap.(of.) 16 |
||
Administrator |
1996-03-28 - 2003-03-20
Briceni, str. Eminescu Mihai, 30, ap.(of.) 17 |
||
Administrator |
1995-01-20 - 2003-06-12
Briceni, Lipcani, str. Cotovschi, 76 |
||
Administrator |
1995-02-13 - 2003-05-22
Briceni, str. Gagarin Iu., 5 |
||
Administrator |
2000-11-01 - 2005-07-07
Hînceşti, str. Chişinăului, 31 |
||
Administrator |
1993-07-19 - 2003-10-13
Hînceşti, Sărata-Galbenă |
||
Administrator |
1996-07-10 - 2003-08-18
Basarabeasca, str. Frunze M., 3 |
||
Administrator |
1997-01-16 - 2004-06-26
Cimişlia, str. Stere C., 88 |
||
Administrator |
1995-08-25 - 2004-10-14
Hînceşti, str. Hîncu Mihalcea, 106, ap.(of.) 30 |
||
Administrator |
1993-02-22 - 2003-09-24
Hînceşti, str. Mitropolit Varlaam, 14, ap.(of.) 4 |
||
Administrator |
1995-04-03 - 2004-02-26
Hînceşti, str. Drăgan Maria, 2 |
||
Administrator |
1995-06-15 - 2003-04-11
Orhei, str. 31 August, 49 |