Intermediaries for the sale of agricultural raw materials, live animals, textile raw materials and semi-products
Possible affiliates
Denumire | Administratori | Statut/ Adresa | |
---|---|---|---|
Administrator |
2007-08-17 - 2021-12-10
Cahul, Slobozia Mare |
||
Administrator |
2003-07-10
Orhei, Clişova |
||
Administrator |
1999-07-19
Teleneşti, Mîndreşti |
||
Administrator |
1996-06-14 - 2022-08-08
Edineţ, Feteşti |
||
Administrator al procesului de insolvabilitate Administrator |
1994-05-26 - 2021-12-14
mun. Chişinău, sec. Centru, str. Şciusev A., 72, ap.(of.) 9 |
||
Administrator |
2006-02-02
Nisporeni, Mileşti |
||
Administrator |
2014-12-05 - 2022-09-01
Edineţ, Brătuşeni |
||
Administrator |
2007-03-07 - 2023-10-17
Soroca, Voloave |
||
Administrator |
1996-11-11
Ialoveni, str. Alexandru cel Bun, 43 |
||
Administrator |
2000-06-28 - 2023-03-22
Leova, str. Gorkii, 6 |
||
Administrator |
1992-08-17 - 2018-04-06
Ungheni, str. Boico Alexandru, 7, ap.(of.) 38 |
||
Administrator |
1995-02-20
Orhei, Mîrzeşti |
||
Administrator |
1992-08-21 - 2018-06-22
Cahul, Alexandru Ioan Cuza |
||
Lichidator Administrator |
2008-02-16
Rezina, str. Lomonosov M., 135 |
||
Administrator |
2007-12-20 - 2023-03-22
Hînceşti, Negrea |
||
Administrator |
2007-04-02
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Petricani, 10 |
||
Lichidator Administrator |
1996-04-02 - 2009-02-02
Teleneşti, Zahareuca |
||
Administrator |
1995-07-12
Edineţ, str. Independenţei, 99 |
||
Administrator |
2008-10-09 - 2021-12-16
Edineţ, str. Bucov E., 34 |
||
Administrator |
1994-12-20 - 2018-12-19
Edineţ, str. Plămădeală A., 3 |
||
Administrator |
2000-01-12 - 2018-12-19
Rezina, str. Eminescu Mihai, 10, ap.(of.) 35 |
||
Administrator |
1995-09-27
Ungheni, Corneşti, str. Ştefan cel Mare, 42, ap.(of.) 12 |
||
Administrator |
1998-06-29 - 2002-12-05
Anenii Noi, Ţînţăreni |
||
Administrator |
2000-03-23 - 2002-10-14
Criuleni, Hîrtopul Mic |
||
Administrator |
1997-12-24 - 2002-12-04
Străşeni, Scoreni |
||
Administrator |
1997-03-11 - 2023-01-13
Edineţ, Rotunda |
||
Administrator |
1998-06-24 - 2003-02-25
Anenii Noi, Ţînţăreni |
||
Administrator |
1998-06-29 - 2003-02-25
Anenii Noi, Ţînţăreni |
||
Administrator |
1998-06-24 - 2003-02-25
Anenii Noi, Ţînţăreni |
||
Administrator |
1998-06-24 - 2003-03-18
Anenii Noi, Ţînţăreni |
||
Administrator al procesului de insolvabilitate Administrator |
1995-12-12 - 2017-09-22
Soroca, str. Cosăuţului, 2 |
||
Administrator |
1995-08-29 - 2018-04-13
Bălţi, str. Calea Ieşilor, 3, ap.(of.) 61 |
||
Administrator |
1995-08-25
Briceni, Grimăncăuţi |
||
Administrator |
2013-02-04
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Dacia bd., 20, ap.(of.) 17 |
||
Administrator |
2001-09-14 - 2003-10-02
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Alba-Iulia, 194/1, ap.(of.) 34 |