Intermediaries for the sale of agricultural raw materials, live animals, textile raw materials and semi-products
Possible affiliates
Denumire | Administratori | Statut/ Adresa | |
---|---|---|---|
Lichidator Administrator |
1997-02-07 - 2012-07-24
Călăraşi, Hirova |
||
Administrator |
1996-02-27 - 2016-03-22
Edineţ, str. Uzinelor, 5 |
||
Administrator |
1994-11-16 - 2016-03-22
Edineţ, Cupcini, str. Sadovaia, 10/14 |
||
Administrator |
1996-04-10
mun. Chişinău, sec. Centru, str. Tighina, 42 |
||
Administrator |
2001-01-02 - 2021-11-17
mun. Chişinău, Durleşti, str. Cuza Vodă, 17/1, ap.(of.) 144 |
||
Administrator Lichidator |
2008-08-28 - 2021-11-16
Călăraşi, Sipoteni, str. Cantemir D., 42/3, ap.(of.) 5 |
||
Administrator |
2004-09-08 - 2021-11-18
Ocniţa, str. Creangă Ion, 43, ap.(of.) 4 |
||
Administrator |
2008-02-12
Ocniţa, Mereşeuca |
||
Administrator |
2008-02-13
Ocniţa, Otaci, str. Doina, 16 |
||
Administrator |
1995-09-14 - 2019-08-09
Edineţ, str. Şoseaua Bucovina, 17, ap.(of.) 45 |
||
Administrator |
1994-08-07 - 2019-08-09
Orhei, Furceni |
||
1994-03-24 - 2012-06-26
Cimişlia, Lipoveni |
|||
Administrator |
1995-06-13 - 2006-07-17
Briceni, Grimăncăuţi |
||
1993-02-23 - 2012-06-26
Cimişlia, Cenac |
|||
Administrator |
1993-05-17 - 2005-08-26
Cimişlia, str. Barbu Lăutaru |
||
Administrator |
2011-06-20 - 2021-11-22
Briceni, Larga |
||
Administrator |
2002-10-17 - 2021-11-22
Străşeni, Tătăreşti |
||
Administrator |
1994-04-12
Străşeni, Vorniceni |
||
Administrator |
1994-10-31
Străşeni, str. Chişinăului, 41 |
||
Administrator |
2001-04-28 - 2023-04-03
Rezina, str. 8 Martie, 8 |
||
Administrator |
1997-01-04
Străşeni, Zubreşti |
||
Administrator |
1997-12-15
Străşeni, str. Ciorbă Toma, 2 |
||
Administrator |
1997-12-29
mun. Chişinău, Truşeni |
||
Administrator |
1998-01-22
mun. Chişinău, Truşeni |
||
Administrator |
1996-06-18
Cahul, Borceag |
||
Administrator |
1996-06-20
Taraclia, Albota de Jos |
||
Administrator |
1996-09-23 - 2020-10-22
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Grădescu Nicolae, 7 |
||
Administrator |
1996-09-20 - 2020-10-22
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Decebal bd., 82, ap.(of.) 140 |
||
Administrator |
1996-09-17 - 2020-10-22
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Grenoble, 209, ap.(of.) 102 |
||
Administrator |
1996-09-17 - 2020-10-22
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Munceşti şos., 788, ap.(of.) 74 |
||
Administrator |
2008-03-28
Edineţ, str. Costin Miron, 42 |
||
Administrator |
1996-09-17 - 2020-10-22
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Pădurii, 8/A |
||
Administrator |
1996-02-06 - 2018-10-04
Leova, str. Mendeleev D., 4 |
||
Administrator |
1996-11-29 - 2021-11-26
Basarabeasca, Abaclia |
||
Administrator |
2008-01-30
Donduşeni, str. Cernov Ion, 112 |