WHOLESALE TRADE AND BROKERAGE, EXCLUDING TRADE IN MOTOR VEHICLES AND MOTORCYCLES
Possible affiliates
Denumire | Administratori | Statut/ Adresa | |
---|---|---|---|
Administrator |
1995-04-07 - 2001-03-27
Briceni, Şirăuţi |
||
Administrator |
1995-04-07 - 2001-02-19
Briceni, Grimăncăuţi |
||
Administrator |
1995-01-10 - 2017-12-12
Rîşcani, str. Gagarin Iu., 6 |
||
Administrator |
1995-04-12 - 2001-06-12
Briceni, Lipcani, str. Stamati C., 21 |
||
Administrator |
1995-01-11 - 2001-03-02
Ocniţa, str. Kiev, 33 |
||
Administrator |
1995-04-14 - 2002-09-06
Briceni, Balasineşti |
||
Administrator |
1995-04-17 - 2002-09-30
Briceni, str. Eminescu Mihai, 24, ap.(of.) 4 |
||
Administrator Lichidator |
1996-09-06 - 2006-01-30
Ungheni, str. Lupu Vasile, 6, ap.(of.) 47 |
||
Administrator |
1997-01-28 - 2019-05-29
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Codreanca, 15/2, ap.(of.) 38 |
||
Administrator |
1995-11-24 - 2019-05-28
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Doga Andrei, 28/2, ap.(of.) 96 |
||
Administrator |
1997-02-26 - 2002-03-04
Ocniţa, Vălcineţ |
||
Administrator |
1995-05-22 - 2001-07-09
Briceni, Pererita |
||
Administrator |
1994-11-28 - 2004-07-08
UTA Găgăuzia, Comrat, str. Lazo S., 35, ap.(of.) 19 |
||
Administrator |
1994-08-16 - 2017-12-12
Bălţi, str. Russo Alecu, 3, ap.(of.) 39 |
||
Administrator |
1995-05-31 - 2000-10-24
Briceni, Berlinţi |
||
Administrator |
1995-07-21 - 2019-04-24
Leova, Băiuş |
||
Administrator |
1995-07-27 - 2019-04-24
Leova, str. Cupcea Valeriu, 17 |
||
Administrator |
1995-07-11 - 2019-04-24
Leova, Iargara, str. Eminescu Mihai, 22 |
||
Administrator |
1995-11-09 - 2019-04-24
Leova, str. Kogălniceanu Mihail, 9, ap.(of.) 461 |
||
Administrator |
1992-10-08 - 1998-03-20
Orhei, str. Iachir I., 12 |
||
Administrator |
1995-06-13 - 1998-01-19
Briceni, Bulboaca |
||
Administrator |
1992-10-13 - 1996-06-01
Orhei, str. Lupu Vasile, 62B |
||
Administrator |
1996-12-03 - 2019-05-30
mun. Chişinău, sec. Ciocana, str. Milescu-Spătarul Nicolae, 15, ap.(of.) 38 |
||
Administrator |
1995-06-26 - 1998-09-10
Briceni, str. Lazo S., 3 |
||
Administrator Lichidator |
1994-11-09 - 2010-11-16
Bălţi, str. Alecsandri Vasile, 2 |
||
Administrator |
1992-07-07 - 2017-12-12
Bălţi, str. Bulgară, 23, ap.(of.) 12 |
||
Administrator |
1993-01-18 - 1996-01-16
Orhei, str. Iachir I., 19, ap.(of.) 57 |
||
Administrator |
1995-07-06 - 1998-11-20
Briceni, str. Gorkii, 3 |
||
Administrator |
1995-10-06 - 2002-09-24
Briceni, str. Frunze M., 23/4 |
||
Administrator |
1995-10-11 - 1998-02-13
Briceni, str. Eminescu Mihai, 79, ap.(of.) 23 |
||
Administrator |
1995-10-18 - 1998-12-16
Briceni, str. 31 August 1989, C.1, ap.(of.) 1 |
||
Administrator |
1995-10-20 - 2002-05-07
Briceni, Tabani |
||
Administrator |
1995-10-24 - 2000-09-29
Briceni, str. Tomah Leonid, 11 |
||
Administrator |
1995-10-27 - 2001-06-11
Briceni, str. Tereşkova, 20 |
||
Administrator |
1993-07-13 - 2017-12-12
Bălţi, str. Mircea cel Bătrîn, 76 |