WHOLESALE TRADE AND BROKERAGE, EXCLUDING TRADE IN MOTOR VEHICLES AND MOTORCYCLES
Possible affiliates
Denumire | Administratori | Statut/ Adresa | |
---|---|---|---|
Administrator |
1995-08-24 - 2018-10-23
Edineţ, str. Rareş Petru, 58 |
||
Administrator |
1995-03-16 - 2018-10-22
Edineţ, str. Alexandru cel Bun, 81 |
||
Administrator |
1995-12-14 - 2018-10-22
Edineţ, str. Independenţei, 84, ap.(of.) 32 |
||
Administrator |
1996-04-02 - 2018-10-22
Edineţ, Trinca |
||
Administrator |
1993-12-17 - 2018-11-27
Edineţ, Cepeleuţi |
||
Administrator |
1996-03-13 - 1999-07-20
Bălţi, str. Tiraspol, 9, ap.(of.) 61 |
||
Administrator |
1995-01-31 - 2017-12-08
Bălţi, str. 1 Mai, 9/B, ap.(of.) 69 |
||
Administrator |
1993-06-23 - 2018-11-27
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Melestiu, 7 |
||
Administrator |
1996-10-28 - 2002-06-10
Bălţi, str. Moldovenească, 73 |
||
Administrator |
1994-06-08 - 2017-12-08
Bălţi, str. Calea Ieşilor, 109, ap.(of.) 32 |
||
Administrator |
1993-11-11 - 2017-12-08
Bălţi, str. Chişinăului, 8 |
||
Administrator |
1992-04-10 - 2017-12-08
Bălţi, str. Nekrasov, 25/A |
||
Administrator |
1997-03-17 - 2002-07-18
Bălţi, str. Arbore Z., 76, ap.(of.) 10 |
||
Administrator |
1993-05-14 - 2017-12-08
Rîşcani, Costeşti, str. Soltîs Ion, 2 |
||
Administrator |
1993-05-11 - 2017-12-08
Rîşcani, str. Volodarski V., 3/A |
||
Administrator |
1995-07-04 - 2017-12-08
Rîşcani, Recea |
||
Administrator |
1995-06-21 - 2018-11-29
mun. Chişinău, sec. Centru, str. Bucureşti, 3, ap.(of.) 5 |
||
Administrator |
1992-09-28 - 2018-11-29
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Botanica Veche, 8, ap.(of.) 55 |
||
Administrator |
1996-09-09 - 2000-04-10
mun. Chişinău, sec. Centru, str. Tighina, 42, ap.(of.) 510 |
||
Administrator |
1993-10-19 - 2017-12-08
Bălţi, str. Regina Maria, 64, ap.(of.) 6 |
||
Administrator |
1995-03-30
Tiraspol, str. Marx Karl, 10, ap.(of.) 7 |
||
Administrator |
1996-03-18
Tiraspol, str. Comsomolului, 10/2, ap.(of.) 19 |
||
Administrator |
1992-07-06
Anenii Noi, Ruseni, str. Sovietică, „.25 |
||
Administrator |
1992-08-13
Anenii Noi, str. 31 August 1989, 4 |
||
Administrator |
1992-09-01
Anenii Noi, Hîrbovăţ |
||
Administrator |
1992-03-30
Anenii Noi, Merenii Noi |
||
Administrator |
1996-07-01 - 2001-03-30
mun. Chişinău, Durleşti, str. Asachi Gh., 2 |
||
Administrator |
1994-11-18
Anenii Noi, str. Chişinăului, 51 |
||
Administrator |
1995-01-18
Anenii Noi, str. <, 6 |
||
Administrator |
1995-07-07
Anenii Noi, Bulboaca, str. Asachi Gh., 3 |
||
Administrator |
1995-08-29
Anenii Noi, Hîrbovăţ |
||
Administrator |
1995-09-01
Anenii Noi, Ruseni |
||
Administrator |
1995-10-24
Anenii Noi, Gura Bîcului |
||
Administrator |
1995-12-01
Anenii Noi, Ţînţăreni, str. Victoriei, 22 |
||
Administrator |
1996-01-29
Anenii Noi, Ţînţăreni |