WHOLESALE TRADE AND BROKERAGE, EXCLUDING TRADE IN MOTOR VEHICLES AND MOTORCYCLES
Possible affiliates
Denumire | Administratori | Statut/ Adresa | |
---|---|---|---|
Administrator |
1996-01-04 - 2018-05-29
Rîşcani, str. Independenţei, 57, ap.(of.) 26 |
||
Administrator |
1992-09-11 - 2017-03-02
Bălţi, str. Independenţei, 32, ap.(of.) 7 |
||
Administrator |
1995-02-20 - 2018-12-04
Edineţ, str. Florar, 55 |
||
Administrator |
1996-01-12 - 2018-11-27
Edineţ, str. 31 August, 3, ap.(of.) 1 |
||
Administrator |
1996-01-26 - 2018-11-27
Edineţ, str. Dostoevschi, 16, ap.(of.) 11 |
||
Administrator |
1995-06-09 - 2018-12-04
Edineţ, str. Mărţişor, 16, ap.(of.) 8 |
||
Administrator |
1996-02-12 - 2017-04-19
Ialoveni, Costeşti |
||
Administrator |
1995-12-13 - 2018-12-04
Edineţ, str. 31 August, 7 |
||
Administrator |
1996-02-13 - 2018-12-04
Edineţ, str. Şoseaua Bucovina, 15, ap.(of.) 36 |
||
Administrator |
1995-02-17
Bălţi, str. Burebista, 16, ap.(of.) 64 |
||
Administrator |
1995-10-02 - 2017-06-12
UTA Găgăuzia, Comrat, str. Pobeda, 285 |
||
Administrator |
1995-10-18 - 2017-06-13
UTA Găgăuzia, Comrat, str. Tretiacova, 38, ap.(of.) 7 |
||
Administrator |
1995-10-10 - 2017-06-13
UTA Găgăuzia, Comrat, str. Studenţilor, 11 |
||
Administrator |
1995-10-24 - 2017-06-12
UTA Găgăuzia, Comrat, str. Şevcenko T., 9 |
||
Administrator |
1996-03-20 - 2017-12-12
Rîşcani, Corlăteni |
||
Administrator |
1996-09-05 - 2017-06-16
mun. Chişinău, sec. Ciocana, str. Mircea cel Bătrân bd., 29/2, ap.(of.) 21 |
||
Administrator |
1994-01-25 - 2017-12-12
Rîşcani, Proscureni |
||
Administrator |
1995-07-21
Bălţi, str. Alexandru cel Bun, 32, ap.(of.) 1 |
||
Administrator |
1994-06-28 - 2017-12-12
Rîşcani, Corlăteni |
||
Administrator |
1995-07-12 - 2021-06-02
mun. Chişinău, sec. Ciocana, str. Zadnipru P., 19/2, ap.(of.) 50 |
||
Administrator |
1995-12-22 - 2018-03-28
Hînceşti, str. Sfânta Maria, 15 |
||
Administrator |
1996-02-28 - 2018-03-28
Hînceşti, str. Chişinăului, 10 |
||
Administrator |
1996-01-05 - 2018-03-28
Hînceşti, str. Chişinăului, 4, ap.(of.) 35 |
||
Administrator |
1995-06-06 - 2018-03-28
Hînceşti, str. Florilor, 1 |
||
Administrator |
1995-07-13 - 2018-03-28
Hînceşti, str. Alexandru cel Bun, 94, ap.(of.) 24 |
||
Administrator |
1995-07-28 - 2018-03-28
Hînceşti, str. Grădinilor, 1 |
||
Administrator |
1996-02-19
Bălţi, str. <, 18 |
||
1995-02-24 - 2010-01-12
Străşeni, str. Chişinăului, 5/1 |
|||
Administrator |
1995-11-29 - 2018-03-28
Hînceşti, str. Alexandru cel Bun, 40, ap.(of.) 2 |
||
Administrator |
1995-11-14 - 2018-03-28
Hînceşti, str. Alexandru cel Bun, 13 |
||
Administrator |
1996-06-10
Bălţi, str. Strîi, 13, ap.(of.) 28 |
||
Administrator |
1996-10-02
Bălţi, str. Calea Ieşilor, 108, ap.(of.) 12 |
||
Administrator |
1995-07-21 - 2002-05-21
Bălţi, str. Bulgară, 33, ap.(of.) 9 |
||
Administrator |
1995-12-25
Soroca, str. Cosăuţului, 13 |
||
Administrator |
1995-02-01 - 2018-10-23
Edineţ, str. Stere Constantin, 40 |