WHOLESALE TRADE AND BROKERAGE, EXCLUDING TRADE IN MOTOR VEHICLES AND MOTORCYCLES
Possible affiliates
Denumire | Administratori | Statut/ Adresa | |
---|---|---|---|
Administrator |
1993-09-08 - 2021-07-09
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Moscova bd., 7/1, ap.(of.) 71 |
||
Administrator |
1995-01-04 - 2021-07-09
Străşeni, str. Viteazul Mihai, 3 |
||
Administrator |
1995-03-22 - 2019-01-11
Edineţ, str. Independenţei, 126, ap.(of.) 11 |
||
Administrator |
1995-05-10 - 2019-01-11
Edineţ, str. Alexandru cel Bun, 63, ap.(of.) 48 |
||
Lichidator Lichidator Lichidator Lichidator Lichidator |
1992-12-30 - 2007-01-05
Anenii Noi, Bulboaca |
||
Administrator |
1995-07-21 - 2019-01-11
Edineţ, Brătuşeni, str. Comsomolului, 88, ap.(of.) 1 |
||
Administrator |
1995-08-23 - 2019-01-11
Edineţ, str. Florar, 105, ap.(of.) 6 |
||
Administrator |
1995-10-13 - 2019-01-11
Edineţ, Cuconeştii Noi |
||
Administrator |
1995-11-27 - 2019-01-11
Edineţ, str. Cirimpei Octavian, 121 |
||
Administrator |
1995-12-11 - 2019-01-11
Edineţ, Trinca |
||
Administrator |
1995-12-27 - 2019-01-11
Edineţ, Tîrnova |
||
Administrator |
1996-03-06 - 2019-01-11
Edineţ, str. Eminescu Mihai, 19 |
||
Administrator |
1996-03-22 - 2019-01-11
Edineţ, Cupcini, str. Livezilor, 8, ap.(of.) 17 |
||
Administrator |
1996-04-03 - 2019-01-11
Edineţ, Trinca |
||
Administrator |
1996-04-10 - 2019-01-11
Edineţ, str. Alexandru cel Bun, 151 |
||
Administrator |
1996-04-24 - 2019-01-11
Edineţ, Volodeni |
||
Administrator |
1996-06-26 - 2019-01-11
Edineţ, Terebna |
||
Administrator |
1996-07-16 - 2019-01-11
Edineţ, Feteşti |
||
Administrator |
1996-08-20 - 2020-03-05
Bender, str. 40 ani Biruinţei, 16, ap.(of.) 18 |
||
1995-07-14 - 2004-04-21
Donduşeni, str. Independenţei, 1/3, ap.(of.) 1 |
|||
Administrator |
1994-09-08 - 2021-07-12
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Creangă Ion, 62 |
||
Administrator |
1994-12-19
Cantemir, str. Trandafirilor, 5, ap.(of.) 15 |
||
Administrator |
1993-01-21
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Puşkin A., 13, ap.(of.) 1 |
||
Administrator |
1994-09-28 - 2021-07-12
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Studenţilor, 3/2, ap.(of.) 12 |
||
Administrator |
1993-07-07 - 2021-07-12
mun. Chişinău, Tohatin |
||
Administrator |
1993-07-07 - 2021-07-13
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Lupu Vasile, 59, ap.(of.) 37 |
||
Administrator |
1995-02-07 - 2021-07-13
mun. Chişinău, sec. Ciocana, str. Mircea cel Bătrân bd., 38/1, ap.(of.) 94 |
||
Administrator |
1996-03-04 - 2021-07-13
mun. Chişinău, Vatra, str. Eminescu Mihai, 21/2, ap.(of.) 21 |
||
Administrator |
1995-07-31 - 2021-07-13
mun. Chişinău, sec. Ciocana, str. Mircea cel Bătrân bd., 7, ap.(of.) 202 |
||
Administrator |
1994-12-29 - 2021-07-13
mun. Chişinău, sec. Centru, str. Ismail, 45, ap.(of.) 18 |
||
Administrator |
1995-04-17 - 2021-07-13
Străşeni, str. Lupu Vasile, 11 |
||
Administrator |
1993-05-04 - 2021-10-18
Anenii Noi, Floreni, str. Chişinău, 3, ap.(of.) 17 |
||
Administrator |
1995-11-20 - 2020-12-29
Cahul, Roşu |
||
Administrator |
2004-04-08 - 2011-04-22
Ocniţa, Mihălăşeni |
||
Administrator |
1992-10-28 - 2021-10-18
Criuleni, str. 31 August 1989, 91, ap.(of.) 21 |