Trade in parts and accessories for motor vehicles
Possible affiliates
Denumire | Administratori | Statut/ Adresa | |
---|---|---|---|
Administrator |
2012-07-13 - 2014-02-13
Leova, Cneazevca |
||
Administrator |
2012-09-14 - 2014-10-08
Cimişlia, str. Decebal, 108, ap.(of.) 20 |
||
Administrator |
1992-11-04 - 2013-09-20
Cimişlia, Gradişte, str. Creangă Ion, 48 |
||
Administrator |
2012-06-28 - 2016-08-26
Orhei, Pelivan |
||
Administrator |
2012-08-13 - 2015-11-19
Orhei, str. Neculce Ion, 59 |
||
Administrator |
2012-12-06 - 2017-01-24
Orhei, str. Unirii, 2, ap.(of.) 27 |
||
Administrator |
2012-12-07 - 2015-09-28
Şoldăneşti, Chipeşca |
||
Administrator |
2012-04-02 - 2014-05-15
Drochia, Fîntîniţa |
||
Administrator |
2013-01-09 - 2013-01-29
Anenii Noi, Maximovca, str. Tineretului |
||
Administrator |
2013-02-12 - 2015-12-11
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Decebal bd., 6/4, ap.(of.) 162 |
||
Administrator Lichidator |
2013-03-22 - 2015-12-23
mun. Chişinău, sec. Ciocana, str. Drăgan Maria, 3/A, ap.(of.) 1 |
||
Administrator |
2013-04-25 - 2015-12-15
mun. Chişinău, sec. Ciocana, str. Vieru Igor, 14/1, ap.(of.) 120 |
||
Administrator |
2013-05-29 - 2015-12-16
mun. Chişinău, sec. Ciocana, str. Transnistria, 5/A |
||
Administrator |
2013-06-20 - 2016-12-13
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Kiev, 6/3, ap.(of.) 44 |
||
Administrator |
2013-07-30 - 2015-12-16
mun. Chişinău, sec. Ciocana, str. Russo Alecu, 55/3, ap.(of.) 12 |
||
Administrator |
1998-04-21 - 2013-09-10
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Drumul Crucii, 83/G |
||
Administrator |
2013-10-16 - 2013-12-16
Străşeni, Rassvet |
||
Administrator |
1995-06-07 - 2013-01-31
Sîngerei, str. Independenţei, 136 |
||
Administrator |
2013-01-29 - 2014-10-28
Bălţi, str. Bulgară, 132, ap.(of.) 11 |
||
Administrator |
1995-11-21 - 2015-10-02
Sîngerei, Bilicenii Vechi |
||
Administrator |
2013-03-12 - 2016-03-18
Bălţi, str. Voluntarilor, 20, ap.(of.) 9 |
||
Administrator |
2007-02-07 - 2021-03-12
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Armenească, 63 |
||
Administrator |
2013-03-29 - 2016-07-12
Cimişlia, Fetiţa |
||
Administrator |
2013-05-24 - 2013-05-30
Basarabeasca, Başcalia |
||
Administrator |
2013-01-31 - 2013-10-18
Şoldăneşti, Climăuţii de Jos |
||
Administrator |
2001-04-28 - 2013-08-17
Orhei, Peresecina |
||
Administrator |
2013-10-10 - 2014-12-01
Orhei, Step-Soci |
||
Administrator |
2013-03-19 - 2013-04-10
Soroca, str. Viilor, 13, ap.(of.) 26 |
||
Administrator |
1998-06-23 - 2013-11-05
Floreşti, Sănătăuca |
||
Administrator |
2004-06-30 - 2020-11-25
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Cuza-Vodă bd., 42, ap.(of.) 69 |
||
Administrator |
2013-01-30 - 2015-04-01
Călăraşi, str. Asachi Gh., 25 |
||
Administrator |
2013-12-11 - 2016-04-21
Ungheni, str. Bernardazzi Alessandro, 15/A |
||
Administrator |
2013-02-20 - 2015-09-11
UTA Găgăuzia, Tomai, str. Jukov, 4 |
||
Administrator |
1997-03-19 - 2013-04-19
UTA Găgăuzia, Ceadîr-Lunga, str. Lenin, 151, ap.(of.) 2 |
||
Administrator |
2013-06-03 - 2013-07-09
UTA Găgăuzia, Congaz, str. Lazo S., 94 |