Wholesale of cereals, seeds, fodder and unprocessed tobacco
Possible affiliates
Denumire | Administratori | Statut/ Adresa | |
---|---|---|---|
Administrator |
2006-11-24
mun. Chişinău, sec. Ciocana, str. Mircea cel Bătrân bd., 12, ap.(of.) 18 |
||
Administrator |
1996-09-17 - 2018-12-20
Şoldăneşti, str. Tinereţii, 24 |
||
Administrator |
2019-12-16
Rîşcani, Zăicani |
||
Administrator |
1996-11-29 - 2018-12-20
Şoldăneşti, str. Păcii, 31, ap.(of.) 21 |
||
Administrator |
1999-04-21 - 2018-12-20
Şoldăneşti, Răspopeni |
||
Administrator |
1992-04-24 - 2018-12-20
Rezina, Pecişte |
||
Administrator |
2019-12-18
Floreşti, Ivanovca |
||
Administrator |
2013-07-16 - 2021-12-20
Edineţ, Şofrîncani |
||
Administrator |
2021-08-18
Leova, Orac |
||
Administrator |
2017-04-25
Criuleni, Măgdăceşti |
||
Administrator |
2019-12-30
Bălţi, str. Academician Lazăr Dubinovschi, 22 |
||
Administrator |
2019-01-04
Cahul, str. Eminescu Mihai, 17 |
||
Administrator |
1994-03-03 - 2018-12-20
Rezina, str. 27 August, 46, ap.(of.) 49 |
||
Administrator |
1994-06-15 - 2018-12-20
Rezina, Saharna |
||
Administrator |
2021-08-26
Leova, Sărăteni |
||
Administrator |
2015-05-06
Ialoveni, Mileştii Mici |
||
Administrator |
2015-05-25
Făleşti, Răuţel |
||
Administrator |
1995-08-07 - 2018-12-20
Rezina, Cinişeuţi |
||
Administrator |
2018-01-25 - 2021-12-17
Glodeni, Cuhneşti |
||
Administrator |
1996-09-04 - 2018-12-20
Rezina, str. Lomonosov M., 176/a |
||
Administrator |
2019-02-13
Cantemir, Plopi |
||
Administrator |
2021-08-26
Hînceşti, Paşcani |
||
Administrator |
2024-07-12
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Ghioceilor, 2/1, ap.(of.) 17 |
||
Administrator |
2021-09-02
Leova, str. Ştefan cel Mare, 1/A |
||
Administrator |
2016-03-22
Făleşti, Bocşa |
||
Administrator |
2019-02-22
Taraclia, str. Zavodscaia, 3 |
||
Administrator |
2019-03-18
Cahul, str. Spirin Ivan, 106, ap.(of.) 10 |
||
Administrator |
2023-02-10
Anenii Noi, Todireşti |
||
Comisia Administrator Comisia Comisia |
1994-09-28
Briceni, str. Constructorilor, 1 |
||
Administrator |
2016-03-25
Ocniţa, Lipnic |
||
Administrator |
2019-04-13
Cahul, Alexandru Ioan Cuza |
||
Administrator |
2019-04-19
Cahul, Roşu |
||
Administrator |
2015-10-27
Nisporeni, str. Viilor, 81 |
||
Administrator |
2018-10-10
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Iazului, 15, ap.(of.) 31 |
||
Administrator |
2016-03-25
UTA Găgăuzia, Beşghioz, str. Kirov, 82 |