Wholesale of cereals, seeds, fodder and unprocessed tobacco
Possible affiliates
Denumire | Administratori | Statut/ Adresa | |
---|---|---|---|
Administrator |
1995-02-27 - 2018-02-26
Orhei, Clişova |
||
Administrator |
1995-02-27 - 2018-02-26
Orhei, Mitoc |
||
Administrator |
1995-03-01 - 2018-02-26
Orhei, Mîrzeşti |
||
Administrator |
1995-03-02 - 2018-02-26
Orhei, str. Doina, 2 |
||
Administrator |
1995-03-03 - 2018-02-26
Orhei, Piatra |
||
Administrator |
1995-03-03 - 2018-02-26
Orhei, Cişmea |
||
Administrator |
1995-03-06 - 2018-02-26
Orhei, Selişte |
||
Administrator |
1995-03-06 - 2018-02-26
Orhei, Peresecina |
||
Administrator |
2019-12-16
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Moscova bd., 13/3A, ap.(of.) 40 |
||
Administrator |
2015-04-16
Străşeni, Negreşti |
||
Administrator |
2019-12-16
Ialoveni, Suruceni |
||
Administrator |
2021-03-09
Donduşeni, Ţaul |
||
Administrator |
2018-02-27
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Marinescu Alexandru, 19/1, ap.(of.) 25 |
||
Administrator |
2018-02-26
Bălţi, str. Alexandru cel Bun, 8, ap.(of.) 42 |
||
Administrator |
2018-01-18
Anenii Noi, Mereni |
||
Administrator |
2018-02-09
Glodeni, Sturzovca |
||
Administrator |
2015-05-22 - 2022-02-23
Ocniţa |
||
Administrator |
2019-12-23
Criuleni, Maşcăuţi |
||
HAMMOD ZIDAN ABDUL RAZAK NASER Administrator |
2019-12-18
Taraclia, Balabanu, str. Miciurin, 1 |
||
Administrator |
2021-03-26
Briceni, Beleavinţi |
||
Administrator |
2003-11-10
Hînceşti, str. Marinescu Alexandru, 4 |
||
Administrator |
2015-03-17
Criuleni, Hîrtopul Mic |
||
Administrator |
2019-12-20
mun. Chişinău, sec. Ciocana, str. Milescu-Spătarul Nicolae, 1, ap.(of.) 19 |
||
Administrator |
2021-04-06
Briceni, Cotiujeni |
||
Administrator |
2018-12-19
Taraclia, Corten, str. Cotovschi, 75 |
||
Administrator |
2017-02-21
Orhei, str. Lupu Vasile, 10, ap.(of.) 10 |
||
Administrator Lichidator |
2017-06-29 - 2022-07-04
UTA Găgăuzia, Comrat, str. Şciors, 16 |
||
Administrator Lichidator |
2019-12-23
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Calea Moşilor, 9/1 |
||
Administrator |
2019-12-26
mun. Chişinău, Stăuceni, str. Biruinţa, 14 |
||
Administrator |
2019-08-21
Floreşti, str. 31 August 1989, 94 |
||
Administrator |
1995-03-06 - 2018-02-28
Orhei, str. Cupcea V., 7, ap.(of.) 36 |
||
Administrator |
1995-03-06 - 2018-02-28
Orhei, str. Costin Miron, 1, ap.(of.) 1 |
||
Administrator |
1995-03-10 - 2018-02-28
Orhei, str. Lupu Vasile, 77, ap.(of.) 4 |
||
Administrator |
1995-03-13 - 2018-02-28
Orhei, str. 1 Mai, 28, ap.(of.) 59 |
||
Administrator |
1995-03-14 - 2018-02-28
Orhei, str. Unirii, 130, ap.(of.) 17 |