Wholesale of cereals, seeds, fodder and unprocessed tobacco
Possible affiliates
Denumire | Administratori | Statut/ Adresa | |
---|---|---|---|
Administrator Administrator provizoriu |
2019-08-09
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Costin Miron, 14, ap.(of.) 165 |
||
Administrator |
2021-01-14
Cahul, str. Tîrgul Vechi, 12 |
||
Administrator Administrator |
2021-01-18
Cahul, Bucuria |
||
Administrator |
2021-01-25
Taraclia, Valea Perjei, str. Ceapaev, 8 |
||
Administrator Administrator |
2018-04-20
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Trandafirilor, 31/1, ap.(of.) 21 |
||
Lichidator Administrator |
2015-05-18 - 2020-10-13
mun. Chişinău, sec. Ciocana, str. Sadoveanu Mihail, 24 |
||
Administrator |
2021-02-01
UTA Găgăuzia, Vulcăneşti, str. Plotnikov str-la, 22 |
||
Administrator |
2017-09-28
Donduşeni, Moşana |
||
Administrator |
2006-05-24
UTA Găgăuzia, Carbalia, str. Gaidarji G., 51 |
||
Administrator Lichidator |
2017-09-26
Drochia, Pelinia |
||
Administrator Administrator |
2015-03-24 - 2020-02-05
Bender, str. 40 let Pobedî, 43, ap.(of.) 67 |
||
Administrator |
2017-11-01
UTA Găgăuzia, Comrat, str. Puşkin A., 37 |
||
Administrator |
1996-11-21 - 2020-04-08
Orhei, str. Sadoveanu M., 28, ap.(of.) 3 |
||
Administrator |
1996-07-12 - 2020-04-08
Orhei, Puţintei |
||
Administrator |
2015-09-07 - 2020-02-05
mun. Chişinău, sec. Centru, str. Ştefan cel Mare şi Sfânt bd., 3 |
||
Administrator |
1996-09-25 - 2020-04-08
Orhei, str. Iachir, 15, ap.(of.) 34 |
||
Administrator |
2021-02-17
Cahul, str. Negruzzi C., 115, ap.(of.) 33 |
||
Administrator |
1996-09-30 - 2020-04-08
Orhei, Selişte |
||
Administrator |
1996-09-30 - 2020-04-08
Orhei, str. Şoimarul, 3, ap.(of.) 89 |
||
Administrator |
1996-08-22 - 2020-04-08
Orhei, str. Sadoveanu M., 26, ap.(of.) 50 |
||
Administrator |
1995-08-24 - 2020-04-08
Şoldăneşti, Salcia |
||
Administrator |
1992-07-09 - 2018-04-04
Hînceşti, Cotul Morii |
||
Administrator |
1995-03-16 - 2020-04-08
Şoldăneşti, str. Regiei, 68 |
||
Administrator |
1995-03-27 - 2020-04-08
Şoldăneşti, str. Regiei, 68 |
||
Administrator |
1995-04-26 - 2020-04-08
Şoldăneşti, str. Muncitorilor, 93, ap.(of.) 8 |
||
Administrator |
2008-06-30
Căuşeni, Zaim |
||
Administrator |
2018-01-11 - 2018-06-08
Anenii Noi, Cobusca Nouă, str. Tineretului, 14 |
||
Administrator |
2018-02-15
Floreşti, Sănătăuca |
||
Administrator |
1998-03-13
Ştefan Vodă, Carahasani |
||
Administrator |
2001-12-14
Teleneşti, Ţînţăreni |
||
Administrator |
2019-08-16
Ialoveni, Mileştii Mici |
||
Administrator |
2013-03-14
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Alba-Iulia, 194, ap.(of.) 32 |
||
Administrator |
2021-03-01
Cahul, Cîşliţa-Prut, str. Frunze, 26 |
||
Administrator |
2021-03-09
Cahul, Colibaşi |
||
Lichidator Administrator |
2016-06-29 - 2018-12-10
Cahul, Roşu |