Intermediation in the trade of various products
Possible affiliates
Denumire | Administratori | Statut/ Adresa | |
---|---|---|---|
Administrator |
1996-06-03 - 2019-12-31
Floreşti, Mărculeşti, str. Sovhozului, 26 |
||
Administrator |
1996-05-08 - 2019-12-31
Floreşti, str. Eternităţii, 12 |
||
Administrator |
1995-05-25 - 2019-12-31
Floreşti, Cunicea |
||
Administrator |
1996-04-01 - 2019-12-31
Floreşti, Ghindeşti, 7/3 |
||
Administrator |
1995-11-30 - 2019-12-31
Floreşti, Sănătăuca |
||
Administrator |
1995-11-16 - 2019-12-31
Floreşti, str. Victoriei bd., 15, ap.(of.) 24 |
||
Administrator |
1996-07-19 - 2015-11-11
Edineţ, str. Roşca Valentin, 159 |
||
Administrator |
2020-07-24
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Rareş Petru, 39/1, ap.(of.) 75 |
||
Administrator |
2020-07-24
Ialoveni, str. Constanţa, 112 |
||
Administrator |
2016-04-28 - 2019-12-31
Soroca, str. Cosăuţului, 15 |
||
Administrator |
1992-11-11 - 2019-12-31
Floreşti, Cunicea |
||
Administrator |
1994-07-07 - 2019-12-31
Floreşti, Tîrgul-Vertiujeni |
||
Administrator |
1994-05-27 - 2019-12-31
Floreşti, Cunicea |
||
Administrator |
1993-12-16 - 2019-12-31
Floreşti, Vertiujeni |
||
Administrator |
1994-02-09 - 2019-12-31
Floreşti, Sănătăuca |
||
Administrator |
1993-07-13 - 2019-12-31
Floreşti, Sănătăuca |
||
Administrator |
1993-10-19 - 2019-12-31
Floreşti, Vertiujeni |
||
Administrator |
1993-02-24 - 2019-12-31
Floreşti, Sănătăuca |
||
Administrator |
1996-11-13 - 2019-12-31
Floreşti, Sănătăuca |
||
Administrator |
1995-03-03 - 2019-12-31
Floreşti, Japca |
||
Administrator |
1995-06-01 - 2019-12-31
Floreşti, Sănătăuca |
||
Administrator |
1995-06-27 - 2019-12-31
Floreşti, Cuhureştii de Jos |
||
Administrator |
1996-07-10 - 2019-12-31
Floreşti, str. Costin Miron, 8 |
||
Administrator |
1995-05-22 - 2019-12-31
Floreşti, Băhrineşti |
||
Administrator |
1995-05-11 - 2019-12-31
Floreşti, str. Ştefan cel Mare, 57/a, ap.(of.) 30 |
||
Administrator |
1996-04-30 - 2019-12-31
Floreşti, Prodăneşti |
||
Administrator |
1995-12-06 - 2019-12-31
Floreşti, str. Viteazul Mihai, 8, ap.(of.) 6 |
||
Administrator |
1995-11-17 - 2019-12-31
Floreşti, Cunicea |
||
Administrator |
1996-02-01 - 2019-12-31
Floreşti, Sănătăuca |
||
Administrator |
1996-05-08 - 2019-12-31
Floreşti, str. Dacia, 23, ap.(of.) 22 |
||
Administrator |
1995-06-15 - 2019-12-31
Floreşti, Cunicea |
||
Administrator |
1994-04-21 - 2019-12-31
Floreşti, str. Dacia, 21/6 |
||
Administrator |
1995-11-30 - 2019-12-31
Floreşti, Japca |
||
Administrator |
2020-07-24
Ialoveni, str. 31 August 1989, 5 |
||
Administrator |
2020-07-27
mun. Chişinău, Durleşti, str. 27 August, 35 |