|
|
2000-10-30
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Suceviţa, 36/4, ap.(of.) 48
|
|
|
|
1994-01-13 - 2020-09-03
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Titulescu N., 14, ap.(of.) 2
|
|
|
|
1992-02-20
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Calea Ieşilor, 61/5, ap.(of.) 15
|
|
|
|
2005-02-23
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Studenţilor str-la, 11/2, ap.(of.) 38
|
|
|
|
2001-12-18
Sîngerei, Rădoaia
|
|
|
|
1998-01-12
mun. Chişinău, Dobrogea, str. Decebal, 15
|
|
|
|
1993-02-19 - 2020-02-10
mun. Chişinău, sec. Ciocana, str. Sadoveanu M., 2/3, ap.(of.) 57
|
|
|
|
2005-03-02
mun. Chişinău, sec. Ciocana, str. Otovasca, 13
|
|
|
|
2005-02-23
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Cuza-Vodă bd., 25/4, ap.(of.) 43
|
|
|
|
2005-03-09
mun. Chişinău, Durleşti, str. Eminescu Mihai, 72
|
|
|
|
2002-04-08
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Moscova bd., 13/5, ap.(of.) 3
|
|
|
|
1994-12-19
mun. Chişinău, sec. Centru, str. Mitropolit Varlaam, 65
|
|
|
|
2001-03-20
mun. Chişinău, Grătieşti, str. 31 August 1989, 8
|
|
|
|
2005-03-17
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Costin Miron, 25
|
|
|
|
1995-02-01 - 2018-04-11
Bălţi, str. Independenţei, 36, ap.(of.) 38
|
|
|
|
1995-02-10 - 2018-04-11
Bălţi, str. Voluntarilor, 55, ap.(of.) 24
|
|
|
|
1999-12-13
mun. Chişinău, Brăila
|
|
|
|
2001-01-23
mun. Chişinău, sec. Centru, str. Mitropolit Gurie Grosu, 26, ap.(of.) 33
|
|
|
|
1999-09-15
mun. Chişinău, sec. Centru, str. Academiei, 3/2
|
|
|
|
1992-11-02
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Decebal bd., 2
|
|
|
|
1996-04-25
mun. Chişinău, sec. Centru, str. Ştefan cel Mare, 128/A, ap.(of.) 30
|
|
|
|
2000-10-23
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Deleanu Liviu, 2, ap.(of.) 144
|
|
|
|
1997-02-18
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Alba-Iulia, 196/1, ap.(of.) 150
|
|
|
|
1992-12-31
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Luncii, 20
|
|
|
|
2005-04-18
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Pelivan Ion, 9, ap.(of.) 58
|
|
|
|
1999-04-21
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Florilor, 12/2
|
|
|
|
2015-02-03
Făleşti, Glinjeni
|
|
|
|
1993-11-01 - 2018-02-12
Ştefan Vodă, Copceac
|
|
|
|
1998-09-01 - 2019-08-05
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Aeroport
|
|
|
|
1997-11-07 - 2020-04-13
mun. Chişinău, Sîngera, str. Lomonosov M., 18
|
|
|
|
2001-12-28
Criuleni, str. Ştefan cel Mare, 50, ap.(of.) 5
|
|
|
|
1995-07-21
Bălţi, str. Ştefan cel Mare, 131
|
|
|
|
1996-03-27
Ialoveni, str. Creangă Ion, 72/A
|
|
|
|
1998-03-05 - 2019-07-02
mun. Chişinău, Vatra, str. Pruncul, 2, ap.(of.) 27
|
|
|
|
2002-07-03
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Albişoara, 8, ap.(of.) 15
|
|