Vegetable growing, fruit growing and increasing nursery production
Possible affiliates
Denumire | Administratori | Statut/ Adresa | |
---|---|---|---|
Administrator |
2004-12-13 - 2010-03-30
Glodeni, Fundurii Vechi |
||
Administrator |
2010-02-13 - 2019-07-31
Orhei, Vatici |
||
Administrator |
2001-06-28 - 2021-11-05
Cimişlia, Gura Galbenei |
||
Administrator |
2004-10-06
Cahul, str. Dunării, 22 |
||
Administrator |
1997-11-14 - 2006-07-17
Ocniţa, Bîrlădeni |
||
Administrator |
2004-02-12
Rîşcani, Răcăria |
||
Administrator |
2014-06-06 - 2021-03-01
mun. Chişinău, sec. Ciocana, str. Uzinelor, 188 |
||
Administrator |
2010-10-21
Ialoveni, Costeşti, str. Sf. Nicolae, 54 |
||
Administrator |
2014-01-28
Teleneşti, Tîrşiţei |
||
Administrator |
2001-01-09
Donduşeni, Tîrnova |
||
Administrator |
2007-06-01 - 2019-08-01
Floreşti, str. Costin Miron, 6, ap.(of.) 30 |
||
Administrator |
2004-12-09
Edineţ, Brătuşeni |
||
Administrator |
2004-12-27 - 2010-12-30
Edineţ, str. Alexandru cel Bun, 65, ap.(of.) 17 |
||
Administrator |
2000-03-23
Leova, Iargara, str. Doina, 46 |
||
Administrator Lichidator |
2004-04-07 - 2008-01-04
Basarabeasca, str. Muncii, 57, ap.(of.) 41 |
||
Administrator |
2003-01-22
Orhei, Jora de Mijloc |
||
Administrator |
1999-06-01
Cimişlia, Mereni |
||
Administrator |
2012-11-12 - 2018-02-09
Drochia, str. Sorocii, 57A |
||
Administrator Lichidator |
2007-06-21
mun. Chişinău, Durleşti, str. Vladimirescu Tudor, 91/1, ap.(of.) 9 |
||
Administrator |
1993-04-20
Hînceşti, str. Melioratorov, 5, ap.(of.) 1 |
||
Administrator Administrator provizoriu |
1994-09-05 - 2019-07-09
Bălţi, str. Lvov, 2, ap.(of.) 1 |
||
Administrator |
2004-04-09
Teleneşti, Sărătenii Vechi |
||
Administrator |
2002-02-13
Orhei, str. Ştefan cel Mare, 5, ap.(of.) 5 |
||
Administrator |
2004-05-11
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Costin Nicolae H., 63/2, ap.(of.) 123 |
||
Administrator |
2004-06-04
Dubăsari, Doroţcaia |
||
Administrator |
2004-07-16 - 2009-01-29
Rezina, Lalova |
||
Administrator |
2004-08-25 - 2009-10-30
Orhei, Selişte |
||
Administrator |
2004-11-25
Teleneşti, Zgărdeşti |
||
Administrator |
2007-04-18 - 2020-02-10
Bălţi, str. Eminescu M. bd., 16, ap.(of.) 2 |
||
Administrator |
1999-03-16 - 2018-09-27
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Cuza-Vodă bd., 16/1, ap.(of.) 10 |
||
Administrator Lichidator |
1998-07-01 - 2006-12-18
Floreşti, Caşunca |
||
Administrator Lichidator |
2001-04-30
Taraclia, Albota de Sus |
||
Administrator |
1997-06-30 - 2000-08-22
Şoldăneşti, Glinjeni |
||
Administrator |
2000-08-07
UTA Găgăuzia, Comrat, str. Lenin, 207, ap.(of.) 1 |
||
Administrator |
2002-07-09
UTA Găgăuzia, Congazcicul de Jos, str. Sadovaia, 31 |