Grain and legume cultivation, including seed production
Possible affiliates
Denumire | Administratori | Statut/ Adresa | |
---|---|---|---|
Lichidator |
2005-07-26 - 2016-02-22
Ungheni, Floreni |
||
Administrator Lichidator |
2010-02-10 - 2016-02-01
Anenii Noi, Gura Bîcului, str. Lazo S., 18 |
||
Lichidator Administrator |
2010-03-12 - 2015-12-14
Cahul, Taraclia de Salcie |
||
Administrator |
2002-04-18
Cahul, Pelinei |
||
Administrator |
2002-04-19
Făleşti, Năvîrneţ |
||
Administrator |
2002-08-21 - 2022-04-13
Teleneşti, Tîrşiţei |
||
Administrator |
2008-02-11 - 2024-04-16
Teleneşti, Ţînţăreni |
||
Administrator |
2002-05-30
Cahul, Badicul Moldovenesc |
||
Administrator |
2002-06-07
Călăraşi, Săseni |
||
Administrator |
2013-12-16
Nisporeni, Selişte |
||
Administrator |
2016-08-26
Donduşeni, Tîrnova |
||
Administrator |
2003-03-22
Cahul, Găvănoasa |
||
Administrator |
2003-04-07
Cahul, Giurgiuleşti |
||
Administrator |
2003-07-10
Donduşeni, Ţaul |
||
Administrator |
2003-07-10
Donduşeni, Ţaul |
||
Administrator |
2003-08-26
Leova, Tomaiul Nou |
||
Administrator |
2003-09-29
Leova, Cupcui |
||
Administrator |
2003-11-10
Cahul, Colibaşi |
||
Administrator Lichidator |
2007-05-16 - 2021-04-19
Nisporeni, str. Ştefan cel Mare, 38 |
||
Administrator Lichidator |
2011-10-07 - 2024-05-07
Soroca, Căinarii Vechi |
||
Administrator |
2021-10-05
Taraclia, Balabanu |
||
Administrator |
2004-09-22
mun. Chişinău, Stăuceni, str. Bucovina, 1/9 |
||
Administrator |
2017-01-26
Cahul, Ursoaia, str. Dzerjinski, 16 |
||
Administrator |
2019-08-13
Cahul, Huluboaia |
||
Administrator |
2014-09-19
Cahul, Iujnoe |
||
Administrator |
2018-02-26
Cahul, Pelinei |
||
Administrator |
2008-02-12 - 2022-05-17
Făleşti, Doltu |
||
Administrator |
1993-04-07 - 2021-05-11
Orhei, Piatra |
||
Administrator |
2013-08-19
Cahul, Burlăceni |
||
Administrator |
1997-11-03 - 2023-12-28
Criuleni, Bălăbăneşti |
||
Administrator |
2003-12-25 - 2024-03-01
Cahul, Tartaul de Salcie |
||
Administrator |
2006-02-21 - 2024-03-01
Cahul, Taraclia de Salcie |
||
Administrator Administrator |
2014-07-02 - 2021-05-17
Cahul, Slobozia Mare |
||
Administrator |
2019-01-10
Cahul, Pelinei |
||
Administrator |
2001-06-08 - 2024-05-10
Cahul, Cucoara |