Cultivation of cereals (exclusively rice), leguminous plants and plants producing oilseeds
Possible affiliates
Denumire | Administratori | Statut/ Adresa | |
---|---|---|---|
Administrator |
2013-01-28
Soroca, Stoicani |
||
Administrator |
2000-04-18
Floreşti, Ciutuleşti |
||
Administrator |
2000-03-01
Floreşti, Zarojeni |
||
Administrator |
2018-01-05
Criuleni, Maşcăuţi |
||
Administrator |
1995-04-20
Teleneşti, Ratuş |
||
Administrator |
2017-03-02 - 2020-08-11
Taraclia, str. Gagarin Iu., 108 |
||
Administrator |
2015-04-01
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Grenoble, 257, ap.(of.) 140 |
||
Administrator |
2004-08-01
Cahul, Andruşul de Sus |
||
Administrator |
2019-07-29
Străşeni, Tătăreşti |
||
Administrator |
1998-07-09 - 2024-02-22
Floreşti, Ion Vodă |
||
Administrator |
2013-01-09
Floreşti, Zăluceni |
||
Administrator |
2017-11-29
Soroca, Rudi |
||
Administrator |
2015-03-27
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Bucureşti, 80 |
||
Administrator |
2015-03-30
Teleneşti, Mîndreşti |
||
Administrator |
2017-10-27
Rezina, Trifeşti |
||
Administrator |
2022-06-06
Soroca, Rubleniţa |
||
Administrator |
2021-12-20
Sîngerei, Biruinţa, str. Independenţei, 1 |
||
Administrator |
2020-02-21
Floreşti, Zăluceni |
||
Administrator |
1995-03-24 - 2020-04-06
Şoldăneşti, Vadul-Raşcov |
||
Administrator |
2015-11-16
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Haşdeu Bogdan Petriceicu, 20, ap.(of.) 4 |
||
Administrator |
1994-04-04 - 2018-07-31
Rezina, str. Lomonosov M., 50 |
||
Administrator |
1995-03-27 - 2020-04-06
Şoldăneşti, Sămăşcani |
||
Administrator |
1994-11-25 - 2018-07-31
Rezina, str. 27 August, 18/A |
||
Administrator |
2011-07-04 - 2024-02-08
Floreşti, Bezeni |
||
Administrator |
2018-03-22 - 2024-02-08
Floreşti, Ion Vodă |
||
Administrator |
1994-09-09 - 2020-04-06
Şoldăneşti, Cotiujenii Mari |
||
Administrator |
1996-04-25 - 2018-07-31
Rezina, str. 1 Mai, 2 |
||
Administrator |
2018-10-05 - 2024-07-11
Drochia, Hăsnăşenii Noi |
||
Administrator |
2018-10-26
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Donici Alexandru, 11, ap.(of.) 1 |
||
Administrator |
1994-01-25 - 2020-04-06
Şoldăneşti, str. Vatra Şoldăneştilor, 10 |
||
Administrator |
2018-02-21 - 2020-10-12
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Romană, 4/1, ap.(of.) 111 |
||
Administrator |
2002-11-11
Floreşti, Prajila |
||
Administrator |
1995-01-23 - 2020-04-06
Şoldăneşti, str. Regiei, 9 |
||
Administrator |
2018-02-16 - 2020-10-12
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Dimo Nicolae, 7/3, ap.(of.) 4 |
||
Administrator |
1995-02-14 - 2020-04-06
Şoldăneşti, str. 31 August 1989, 35, ap.(of.) 7 |