Cultivation of cereals (exclusively rice), leguminous plants and plants producing oilseeds
Possible affiliates
Denumire | Administratori | Statut/ Adresa | |
---|---|---|---|
Administrator |
2015-07-30
Soroca, Egoreni |
||
Administrator |
2015-12-15
mun. Chişinău, sec. Centru, str. Ismail, 86/1, ap.(of.) 237 |
||
Administrator |
2012-07-03
Soroca, Egoreni |
||
Administrator |
2021-02-05
Rîşcani, Corlăteni |
||
Administrator |
2012-03-12
Ialoveni, Puhoi |
||
Administrator |
1996-10-28 - 2015-08-22
Orhei, str. Lupu Vasile, 29, ap.(of.) 2 |
||
Administrator |
2016-04-04
Soroca, Iorjniţa |
||
Administrator |
2014-05-20
Soroca, Egoreni |
||
Administrator |
2021-02-05
Glodeni, Ciuciulea |
||
Administrator |
2017-09-15
Briceni, Grimăncăuţi, str. <, 17 |
||
Administrator |
2003-05-19
Hînceşti, Cărpineni |
||
Administrator |
2015-10-01
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Socoleni, 23, ap.(of.) 104 |
||
Administrator |
2014-11-06
Căuşeni, str. Decebal, 43 |
||
Administrator |
2014-05-12
Soroca, Egoreni |
||
Administrator |
2015-03-18
Soroca, Egoreni |
||
Administrator |
2019-01-25
Soroca, Rubleniţa |
||
Lichidator Administrator |
2015-11-13 - 2017-12-11
Drochia, Şuri |
||
Administrator |
2015-08-10
mun. Chişinău, sec. Centru, str. Tighina, 49/3, ap.(of.) 34 |
||
Administrator |
2017-09-18
UTA Găgăuzia, Comrat, str. Jukov, 12 |
||
Administrator |
2018-02-01
Drochia, str. Alecsandri Vasile, 19 |
||
Administrator |
2021-02-15
Bălţi, Sadovoe |
||
Administrator |
2014-05-12
Soroca, Egoreni |
||
Administrator |
2017-12-11
Cahul, Vadul lui Isac |
||
Administrator |
2015-06-11
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Alba-Iulia, 206/1, ap.(of.) 37 |
||
Administrator |
2015-06-11
Floreşti, Vertiujeni |
||
Administrator |
1994-03-29 - 2017-09-15
Drochia, str. Ceaikovski P., 4a |
||
Administrator |
1995-02-13 - 2017-09-15
Drochia, str. Independenţei, 36a, ap.(of.) 94 |
||
Administrator |
2017-11-15
Dubăsari, Coşniţa |
||
Administrator |
2018-04-11 - 2024-02-09
Cantemir, Coştangalia |
||
Administrator |
2015-12-24
UTA Găgăuzia, Copceac, str. Gorkii, 41 |
||
Administrator |
2000-04-17 - 2023-11-29
Sîngerei, Mîndreştii Noi |
||
Administrator |
2017-09-19
mun. Chişinău, Codru, str. Creangă Ion, 24 |
||
Administrator |
2024-01-17
Orhei, Pelivan |
||
Administrator |
2018-01-31
Hînceşti, Bozieni |
||
Administrator |
2013-02-27
mun. Chişinău, Ghidighici, str. Ştefan cel Mare, 2 |