Cultivation of cereals (exclusively rice), leguminous plants and plants producing oilseeds
Possible affiliates
Denumire | Administratori | Statut/ Adresa | |
---|---|---|---|
Administrator |
2021-12-31
mun. Chişinău, sec. Centru, str. Ciuflea, 1 |
||
Administrator Lichidator |
2018-10-19
Floreşti, Gura Căinarului |
||
Administrator |
2021-03-19
Soroca, Rudi |
||
Administrator |
2017-07-04
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Calea Ieşilor, 9/3, ap.(of.) 2 |
||
Administrator |
2016-03-31
Ştefan Vodă, Antoneşti |
||
Administrator |
2015-12-24
Ungheni, Ţîghira |
||
Administrator |
2017-02-16
UTA Găgăuzia, Comrat, str. Pobedî, 113 |
||
Administrator |
1994-12-06 - 2017-10-04
Orhei, str. Negruzzi C., 22 |
||
Administrator |
1994-12-12 - 2017-10-04
Orhei, str. Belski Alexei, 16 |
||
Administrator |
1994-12-12 - 2017-10-04
Orhei, str. Eminescu M., 19, ap.(of.) 41 |
||
Administrator |
1994-12-12 - 2017-10-04
Orhei, str. Pelivan Ion, 34 |
||
Administrator |
1994-12-26 - 2017-10-04
Orhei, str. Iachir I., 29, ap.(of.) 26 |
||
Administrator |
2015-12-24
Călăraşi, Vălcineţ |
||
Administrator |
1996-03-20 - 2024-06-04
Anenii Noi, Cobusca Veche |
||
Administrator |
1997-01-17 - 2024-09-11
Criuleni, Drăsliceni |
||
Administrator |
1995-09-15 - 2019-05-28
UTA Găgăuzia, Joltai, str. Frunze M., 50 |
||
Administrator |
2019-05-23
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Calea Ieşilor, 51/2, ap.(of.) 11 |
||
Administrator |
2024-06-26
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Balcani şos., 7/A |
||
Administrator |
2016-04-20
Făleşti, Mărăndeni, str. Ştefan cel Mare, 65 |
||
Administrator |
2014-03-05
Soroca, Racovăţ |
||
Administrator |
2012-12-08
Donduşeni, Frasin |
||
Administrator |
2010-09-18 - 2021-02-02
Floreşti, Zăluceni |
||
Administrator |
2015-07-20
Cimişlia, str. Decebal, 127 |
||
Administrator |
2024-06-04
Bălţi, str. Krîlov, 26, ap.(of.) 23 |
||
Administrator |
2018-12-17
mun. Chişinău, sec. Centru, str. Micle Veronica, 1 |
||
Administrator |
2018-09-19
Floreşti, Roşieticii Vechi |
||
Administrator |
2022-05-24
Ştefan Vodă, str. Mateevici A., 6, ap.(of.) 9 |
||
Administrator |
2014-04-30
Ialoveni, Costeşti |
||
Administrator |
2016-07-26
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Zelinski Nicolai, 44, ap.(of.) 103 |
||
Administrator |
2021-01-13
Bălţi, str. Boţu Pavel, 39 |
||
Administrator |
2015-08-06
Soroca, Egoreni |
||
Administrator |
1993-09-08 - 2019-01-23
Soroca, str. Ocolirii, 3 |
||
Administrator |
1997-07-14 - 2019-01-23
Soroca, str. Parşin, 24 |
||
Administrator |
1993-06-17 - 2019-01-23
Soroca, str. Tineretului, 18/A |
||
Administrator |
1995-12-29 - 2019-01-23
Floreşti, Japca |