Cultivation of cereals (exclusively rice), leguminous plants and plants producing oilseeds
Possible affiliates
Denumire | Administratori | Statut/ Adresa | |
---|---|---|---|
Administrator |
2000-01-20 - 2017-05-15
Teleneşti, Brînzenii Vechi |
||
Administrator |
2000-11-16 - 2017-05-15
Teleneşti, Budăi |
||
Administrator |
1994-11-04 - 2017-05-15
Orhei, Susleni |
||
Administrator |
2021-03-01
Floreşti, Ivanovca |
||
Administrator |
2018-10-18
UTA Găgăuzia, Chirsova, str. Olimpică, 20 |
||
Administrator |
2021-09-17
mun. Chişinău, sec. Centru, str. Drumul Viilor, 43, ap.(of.) 34 |
||
Administrator |
2019-04-02 - 2024-05-14
Sîngerei, Bursuceni |
||
Administrator |
2002-10-15 - 2024-03-04
Glodeni, Petrunea |
||
Administrator |
2018-12-03 - 2019-11-25
UTA Găgăuzia, Comrat, str. Dubinin, 5, ap.(of.) 8 |
||
Administrator |
2004-08-10 - 2024-03-04
Glodeni, Camenca |
||
Administrator Administrator provizoriu |
2020-12-11
Hînceşti, Buţeni |
||
Administrator Lichidator |
2018-12-12
UTA Găgăuzia, Comrat, str. Şolohov Mihail, 3 |
||
Administrator |
1995-09-25 - 2020-09-16
Orhei, str. Cupcea V., 3, ap.(of.) 39 |
||
Administrator |
2017-03-23
Glodeni, Ciuciulea |
||
Administrator |
2022-02-11
Sîngerei, str. Asachi Gh., 1 |
||
Administrator |
2000-03-05 - 2023-11-23
Rezina, Cuizăuca |
||
Administrator |
2017-04-10
Hînceşti, Rusca |
||
Administrator |
1999-06-22
Edineţ, Rotunda |
||
Administrator |
2006-04-20
Criuleni, Ratuş |
||
Administrator |
2001-04-08 - 2023-11-23
Rezina, Sîrcova |
||
Administrator |
1992-12-14 - 2020-09-16
Teleneşti, str. Vieru Igor, 8 |
||
Administrator |
2021-09-22
Ialoveni, Costeşti |
||
Administrator |
2004-05-28
Edineţ, Bleşteni |
||
Administrator |
2019-01-14
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Lupu Vasile, 16 |
||
Administrator |
2019-01-15
mun. Chişinău, sec. Ciocana, str. Mircea cel Bătrân bd., 22/5, ap.(of.) 94 |
||
Administrator |
2022-09-30
Ialoveni, str. Moldova, 8A |
||
Administrator |
2021-09-21
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Titulescu Nicolae, 14 |
||
Administrator |
2018-07-04
UTA Găgăuzia, Ferapontievca, str. Mira, 1/1 |
||
Administrator Administrator provizoriu |
2020-02-25
Cahul, str. Prospectul Republicii, 15/4 |
||
Administrator |
2006-02-17
Edineţ, Lopatnic |
||
Administrator |
2005-11-02
Cimişlia, Gura Galbenei |
||
Administrator |
2024-08-09
Cahul, Giurgiuleşti |
||
Administrator Lichidator |
2016-05-27
Anenii Noi, Merenii Noi, str. Donici A., 10 |
||
Administrator |
2017-05-03
Floreşti, str. Ştefan cel Mare, 65, ap.(of.) 23 |
||
Administrator |
1999-12-30
Briceni, Colicăuţi |