Cultivation of cereals (exclusively rice), leguminous plants and plants producing oilseeds
Possible affiliates
Denumire | Administratori | Statut/ Adresa | |
---|---|---|---|
Administrator |
1999-11-24
UTA Găgăuzia, Comrat, str. Gavrilova, 115a |
||
Administrator |
2021-01-06
Criuleni, Maşcăuţi |
||
Administrator |
2017-07-07
Căuşeni, Tănătari, str. Păcii, 12 |
||
Administrator |
2008-02-13 - 2023-03-27
Edineţ, Hlinaia |
||
Administrator |
2004-12-17
Briceni, Lipcani, str. Jukovski, 79 |
||
Administrator |
2006-07-06
Orhei, str. Lăpuşneanu A., 2/2 |
||
Administrator |
2020-02-28
UTA Găgăuzia, Vulcăneşti, str. Pobedî, 2 |
||
Administrator |
2020-12-09
UTA Găgăuzia, Vulcăneşti, str. Iachir I., 21 |
||
Administrator |
2007-09-25 - 2023-12-08
Sîngerei, Sîngereii Noi |
||
Administrator |
2004-01-05
Donduşeni, Pocrovca |
||
Administrator |
2008-09-02
Donduşeni, Pivniceni |
||
Administrator |
2018-06-25
Donduşeni, Frasin |
||
Administrator |
2012-04-13
Ialoveni, Puhoi |
||
Administrator |
2005-05-23 - 2023-12-08
Anenii Noi, Varniţa |
||
Administrator |
2003-11-12 - 2024-05-23
Edineţ, Ruseni |
||
Administrator |
2019-01-17
Donduşeni, Frasin |
||
Administrator |
2011-11-15
Făleşti, Obreja Nouă |
||
Administrator |
2004-09-07
Briceni, Beleavinţi |
||
Administrator |
2024-05-23
Edineţ, str. Asachi Gheorghe, 20 |
||
Administrator |
2004-05-10
Edineţ, Hincăuţi |
||
Administrator |
2011-07-26
Edineţ, Fîntîna Albă |
||
Administrator |
2000-12-01 - 2023-03-16
Donduşeni, Pocrovca |
||
Administrator |
2006-01-16 - 2023-03-16
Edineţ, Ruseni |
||
Administrator |
2017-11-16
Căuşeni, Opaci |
||
Administrator |
2023-12-07
Anenii Noi, Calfa, str. Cireşelor, 12 |
||
Administrator |
2017-08-23 - 2024-01-16
UTA Găgăuzia, Cazaclia, str. Voroşilov str-la, 4 |
||
Administrator |
2016-10-19
Rezina, Mateuţi |
||
Administrator |
2016-06-15 - 2024-05-23
Rezina, Ignăţei |
||
Administrator |
2020-12-29
Briceni, Mărcăuţi |
||
Administrator |
2007-07-06 - 2024-05-23
Rezina, Horodişte |
||
Administrator |
2019-04-19 - 2023-03-15
Ocniţa, Mereşeuca |
||
Administrator |
1999-06-03 - 2023-03-15
Ocniţa, Paladea |
||
Administrator |
2015-04-24
Şoldăneşti, str. Mateevici A., 5 |
||
Administrator |
2024-05-24
UTA Găgăuzia, Svetlîi, str. Marx Karl, 13 |
||
Administrator |
2022-09-28
Nisporeni, Vărzăreşti |