Retail trade in tobacco products
Possible affiliates
Denumire | Administratori | Statut/ Adresa | |
---|---|---|---|
Administrator |
2005-08-30 - 2019-05-22
Donduşeni, str. 31 August, 15, ap.(of.) 16 |
||
Lichidator Administrator |
1998-09-24 - 2021-01-21
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Vieru Grigore bd., 26A |
||
Administrator Administrator provizoriu |
2005-11-22
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Goga Octavian, 8, ap.(of.) 4 |
||
Administrator |
2008-06-04 - 2010-02-10
UTA Găgăuzia, Comrat, str. Gavriliuca, 75 |
||
Administrator |
2004-04-08 - 2017-09-04
Orhei, str. Scrisului Latin, 15/A |
||
Administrator |
2006-05-05
Floreşti, Rădulenii Vechi |
||
Administrator |
2007-02-05 - 2020-07-22
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Burebista, 42, ap.(of.) 114 |
||
Administrator |
2006-10-12
mun. Chişinău, Cricova, str. Chişinăului, 30 |
||
Administrator |
2007-04-05 - 2019-11-07
Ialoveni, Costeşti |
||
Administrator |
2007-11-05 - 2019-11-07
Ialoveni, Ruseştii Noi |
||
Administrator |
2007-02-27
Criuleni, str. 31 August 1989, 1 |
||
Administrator |
2008-05-14 - 2021-09-17
Străşeni, str. Rareş Petru, 13 |
||
Administrator |
2008-11-07 - 2021-09-17
Ialoveni, str. Cristea Alexandru, 10 |
||
Administrator |
2002-11-25 - 2020-11-09
mun. Chişinău, sec. Ciocana, str. Mircea cel Bătrân bd., 28/1, ap.(of.) 3 |
||
Administrator |
1998-08-11
Floreşti, Domulgeni |
||
Administrator |
2005-03-30 - 2021-01-29
mun. Chişinău, Budeşti, str. Chişinăului, 153 |
||
Administrator |
2004-05-31 - 2021-09-14
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Alba-Iulia, 196/1, ap.(of.) 70 |
||
Administrator |
2007-12-03 - 2021-02-01
mun. Chişinău, sec. Ciocana, str. Vieru Igor, 18/1, ap.(of.) 69 |
||
Administrator |
2006-06-14 - 2021-09-14
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Traian bd., 21/3, ap.(of.) 155 |
||
Administrator |
2008-08-14 - 2019-11-07
mun. Chişinău, sec. Centru, str. Grenoble, 165/1, ap.(of.) 49 |
||
Administrator |
2007-01-16 - 2023-02-17
Briceni, Beleavinţi |
||
Administrator |
2003-01-03
mun. Chişinău, sec. Ciocana, str. Mircea cel Bătrân bd., 4, ap.(of.) 124 |
||
Administrator |
2007-02-23 - 2017-09-05
Drochia, Sofia |
||
Administrator |
1997-09-17 - 2017-09-04
Drochia, str. Stamati C., 14 |
||
Administrator |
2007-06-05 - 2017-09-05
Soroca, Nimereuca |
||
Administrator |
2006-04-26
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Dorobanţi, 1 |
||
Administrator |
2005-05-26 - 2012-12-12
Străşeni, Negreşti |
||
Administrator |
2007-04-19 - 2012-12-04
Donduşeni, Tîrnova |
||
Administrator |
2002-09-20 - 2024-01-04
Ialoveni, str. Păcii, 1, ap.(of.) 9 |
||
Administrator |
2008-05-28 - 2013-07-02
Criuleni, Coşerniţa |
||
Administrator |
2003-02-03 - 2021-02-01
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Magda Isanos, 15, ap.(of.) 30 |
||
Administrator |
2007-10-02 - 2020-03-20
Soroca, str. Viilor, 5, ap.(of.) 8 |
||
Administrator |
2005-09-29 - 2022-01-31
Briceni, Corjeuţi |
||
Administrator |
1997-07-07 - 2022-01-31
Edineţ, Rotunda |
||
Administrator |
2003-05-26 - 2012-12-27
mun. Chişinău, Băcioi |