|
|
2002-09-26 - 2021-01-29
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Costin Miron, 13/2, ap.(of.) 1
|
|
|
|
2007-07-23
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Mesager, 5/1
|
|
|
|
2002-11-18 - 2021-01-29
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Albişoara, 82/2, ap.(of.) 90
|
|
|
|
2013-02-13
mun. Chişinău, sec. Ciocana, str. Transnistria, 4
|
|
|
|
1993-09-06 - 2017-03-02
Bălţi, str. Franco I., 7
|
|
|
|
2007-07-19 - 2008-03-26
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Trandafirilor, 35/4, ap.(of.) 43
|
|
|
|
2007-08-01
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Dacia bd., 3/4
|
|
|
|
2007-07-19
Criuleni, Hruşova
|
|
|
|
2007-07-19
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Valea Crucii, 26, ap.(of.) 70
|
|
|
|
2007-08-01
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Moscova bd., 13/4, ap.(of.) 8
|
|
|
|
2004-02-24
Soroca, str. Ştefan cel Mare, 121, ap.(of.) 9
|
|
|
|
2007-07-20
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Cuza-Vodă bd., 6/4, ap.(of.) 67
|
|
|
|
1994-04-27 - 2007-08-02
Criuleni, Boşcana
|
|
|
|
2017-11-20 - 2022-05-04
mun. Chişinău, sec. Ciocana, str. Mircea cel Bătrân bd., 40/1, ap.(of.) 37
|
|
|
|
2007-02-22 - 2021-11-23
Ialoveni, Suruceni
|
|
|
|
2007-07-20 - 2009-10-02
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Hristo Botev, 13/2, ap.(of.) 27
|
|
|
|
2020-03-09
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Albişoara, 76/1, ap.(of.) 74
|
|
|
|
2007-07-20
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Decebal bd., 89, ap.(of.) 174
|
|
|
|
2007-08-02
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Bulgară, 84/1
|
|
|
|
2017-06-12
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Dacia bd., 40/2
|
|
|
|
1999-06-28 - 2017-04-03
Cantemir, Goteşti
|
|
|
|
2014-03-06 - 2022-10-24
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Munceşti, 29/1
|
|
|
|
2007-07-20
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Florilor, 32, ap.(of.) 16
|
|
|
|
2007-08-08 - 2023-09-19
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Bănulescu-Bodoni G., 45
|
|
|
|
2007-08-08
mun. Chişinău, sec. Ciocana, str. Russo Alecu, 61/2, ap.(of.) 63
|
|
|
|
2007-08-02
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Şciusev A., 66, ap.(of.) 6
|
|
|
|
2007-07-23
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Munceşti şos., 326, ap.(of.) 54
|
|
|
|
1998-06-11
mun. Chişinău, sec. Centru, str. Şciusev A., 42
|
|
|
|
1996-04-04 - 2018-11-21
UTA Găgăuzia, Baurci, str. 40 let Octeabrea, 154
|
|
|
|
2007-07-23
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Dacia bd., 31
|
|
|
|
2002-12-12 - 2021-01-29
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Dimo N., 12, ap.(of.) 16
|
|
|
|
2007-07-23
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Donici A., 58
|
|
|
|
2007-07-24
Ialoveni, Horodca
|
|
|
|
1995-07-13
mun. Chişinău, sec. Centru, str. Bernardazzi Alexandru, 42, ap.(of.) 18
|
|
|
|
2007-07-25 - 2010-01-28
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Suceviţa, 34/2, ap.(of.) 72
|
|