|
|
2008-04-08 - 2018-12-21
mun. Chişinău, Codru, str. Costiujeni, 3/2, ap.(of.) 208
|
|
|
|
2012-09-07 - 2013-01-11
Orhei, Selişte
|
|
|
|
1992-12-02 - 2012-10-22
Drochia, str. Doina, 21, ap.(of.) 3
|
|
|
|
1994-05-26 - 2012-08-29
Drochia, str. Sfatul Ţării, 26, ap.(of.) 23
|
|
|
|
2001-02-23 - 2014-11-12
mun. Chişinău, sec. Centru, str. Eminescu Mihai, 50, ap.(of.) 320
|
|
|
|
2001-06-22 - 2013-12-24
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Şciusev A., 64
|
|
|
|
2002-11-26 - 2013-06-10
Glodeni, Viişoara
|
|
|
|
1997-07-11 - 2018-08-17
Hînceşti, str. Comisarul Mihai Moraru, 49/A
|
|
|
|
2011-08-03 - 2018-11-12
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Doga Andrei, 32, ap.(of.) 182
|
|
|
|
2006-06-21 - 2020-02-13
mun. Chişinău, sec. Centru, str. Negruzzi Constantin bd., 5, ap.(of.) 100
|
|
|
|
2002-12-02 - 2015-01-31
Ocniţa, str. Gagarin Iu., 62
|
|
|
|
2001-11-28 - 2014-10-03
Hînceşti, str. 31 August, 5, ap.(of.) 15
|
|
|
|
1992-10-07 - 2016-08-12
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Tănase Constantin, 6
|
|
|
|
2002-02-18 - 2014-11-05
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Cornului, 11/1, ap.(of.) 32
|
|
|
|
1999-08-12 - 2014-02-10
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Vieru Grigore bd., 22/1
|
|
|
|
1996-04-30 - 2018-11-12
mun. Chişinău, Codru, str. Costiujeni, 18, ap.(of.) 19
|
|
|
|
2003-06-04 - 2016-09-01
mun. Chişinău, sec. Centru, str. Eminescu Mihai, 63
|
|
|
|
2001-12-12 - 2015-06-18
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Dimo N., 12
|
|
|
|
2009-12-15 - 2021-03-11
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Munceşti şos., 29/1
|
|
|
|
2002-10-01 - 2016-02-22
Bălţi, str. Academician Vladimir Belousov, 47, ap.(of.) 30
|
|
|
|
1998-06-11 - 2015-06-19
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Bănulescu-Bodoni Gavril, 57/1
|
|
|
|
2003-11-24 - 2013-06-18
mun. Chişinău, sec. Centru, str. Mitropolit Gurie Grosu, 5, ap.(of.) 20
|
|
|
|
2013-02-27 - 2021-03-11
mun. Chişinău, sec. Ciocana, str. Ginta Latină, 13, ap.(of.) 31
|
|
|
|
2013-06-07 - 2021-03-11
mun. Chişinău, sec. Ciocana, str. Russo Alecu, 61/6, ap.(of.) 58
|
|
|
|
2007-10-01 - 2013-01-09
Ocniţa, Lipnic
|
|
|
|
2008-04-07 - 2013-01-03
mun. Chişinău, Ghidighici, str. Mateevici A., 10, ap.(of.) 1
|
|
|
|
1996-01-10 - 2015-09-29
UTA Găgăuzia, Vulcăneşti, str. 1 Mai, 8, ap.(of.) 12
|
|
|
|
2008-11-05 - 2021-03-11
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Bănulescu-Bodoni Gavril, 59
|
|
|
|
2010-10-25
mun. Chişinău, sec. Centru, str. Alecsandri Vasile, 97
|
|
|
|
2009-03-14 - 2020-11-20
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Dacia bd., 21, ap.(of.) 151
|
|
|
|
2004-02-05 - 2020-10-29
mun. Chişinău, sec. Ciocana, str. Vieru Igor, 4, ap.(of.) 60
|
|
|
|
2011-12-23 - 2021-12-28
Criuleni, str. Biruinţei bd., 6/A, ap.(of.) 2
|
|
|
|
2010-02-01 - 2021-03-11
mun. Chişinău, sec. Ciocana, str. Profesor Ion Dumeniuk, 16, ap.(of.) 69
|
|
|
|
2010-11-09 - 2021-03-11
mun. Chişinău, sec. Ciocana, str. Vadul lui Vodă, 60, ap.(of.) 53
|
|
|
|
2010-12-21 - 2021-03-11
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Hristo Botev, 11/2, ap.(of.) 45
|
|