|
|
2007-03-28 - 2021-03-31
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Albişoara, 86/3, ap.(of.) 804
|
|
|
|
2009-06-09 - 2020-03-26
Edineţ, str. Independenţei, 116/2
|
|
|
|
1993-04-07 - 2020-04-16
UTA Găgăuzia, Comrat, str. Lenin, 196
|
|
|
|
1994-12-08
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Traian bd., 2, ap.(of.) 20
|
|
|
|
1992-07-29
Floreşti, str. Lupu Vasile, 62
|
|
|
|
2007-02-06 - 2020-05-21
mun. Chişinău, Durleşti, str. Ştefan Vodă, 80
|
|
|
|
2013-03-13 - 2020-05-21
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Costin Nicolae H., 63/1, ap.(of.) 208
|
|
|
|
2007-05-16 - 2020-05-22
Străşeni, str. Prieteniei, 6, ap.(of.) 13
|
|
|
|
2011-12-23 - 2020-05-22
Ungheni, str. Ungureanu Oleg, 9/1, ap.(of.) 11
|
|
|
|
2013-04-08 - 2020-05-22
Străşeni, Bucovăţ, str. Maria Magdalena, 44
|
|
|
|
2013-04-17 - 2020-05-22
Ialoveni, Văsieni
|
|
|
|
2013-05-27 - 2020-05-22
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Sarmizegetusa, 18/3, ap.(of.) 1
|
|
|
|
2013-05-21 - 2020-05-22
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Costin Miron, 3/1, ap.(of.) 45
|
|
|
|
2005-07-28 - 2020-05-22
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Călinescu George, 2, ap.(of.) 17
|
|
|
|
2003-11-06
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Independenţei, 24/2, ap.(of.) 82
|
|
|
|
2006-11-20 - 2020-05-25
mun. Chişinău, sec. Ciocana, str. Sadoveanu M., 28, ap.(of.) 278
|
|
|
|
2006-12-25 - 2020-05-25
Ialoveni, str. Alexandru cel Bun, 9/1, ap.(of.) 115
|
|
|
|
2007-07-05 - 2020-05-25
Străşeni, Pănăşeşti
|
|
|
|
2013-03-07 - 2020-05-25
Ialoveni, str. Alexandru cel Bun, 57
|
|
|
|
2007-04-20 - 2020-05-26
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Şciusev A., 141, ap.(of.) 3
|
|
|
|
2000-05-29 - 2020-05-26
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Dacia bd., 51/1, ap.(of.) 210
|
|
|
|
2011-02-09 - 2020-05-27
mun. Chişinău, sec. Ciocana, str. Industrială, 21, ap.(of.) 302
|
|
|
|
2011-08-16 - 2020-05-27
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Botezatu Alexandru, 5, ap.(of.) 13
|
|
|
|
2013-05-08 - 2020-05-26
mun. Chişinău, Codru, str. Drumul Schinoasei, 130/1
|
|
|
|
2009-06-29 - 2020-05-27
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Bogdan-Voievod, 6/3, ap.(of.) 40
|
|
|
|
2008-09-29 - 2020-05-28
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Studenţilor, 7/3, ap.(of.) 125
|
|
|
|
2008-10-09 - 2020-05-28
mun. Chişinău, Stăuceni, str. Rareş Petru, 5, ap.(of.) 4
|
|
|
|
2008-04-24 - 2020-05-27
Criuleni, Slobozia-Duşca
|
|
|
|
2004-11-04
Rezina, str. Florilor, 7
|
|
|
|
2008-12-12 - 2020-05-28
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Russo Nadejda, 1/2
|
|
|
|
1992-08-11 - 2020-03-24
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Calea Moşilor, 7
|
|
|
|
2014-09-23 - 2020-05-29
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Trandafirilor, 31/3, ap.(of.) 36
|
|
|
|
2008-01-21 - 2020-06-01
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Vladimirescu Tudor, 1/5, ap.(of.) 15
|
|
|
|
1995-08-30 - 2020-06-01
mun. Chişinău, sec. Centru, str. Dokuceaev V., 3, ap.(of.) 2
|
|
|
|
2009-12-16 - 2020-06-02
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Vladimirescu Tudor, 1, ap.(of.) 37
|
|