|
|
2000-09-11
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Dacia bd., 50, ap.(of.) 210
|
|
|
|
2000-09-18
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Cetatea Albă, 141, ap.(of.) 82
|
|
|
|
1998-01-13
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Traian bd., 1/1, ap.(of.) 71
|
|
|
|
2008-06-25
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Hristo Botev, 29, ap.(of.) 60B
|
|
|
|
1998-02-04
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Dacia bd., 22, ap.(of.) 123
|
|
|
|
1998-02-05
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Dacia bd., 53, ap.(of.) 105
|
|
|
|
1998-02-06
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Hristo Botev, 19/7, ap.(of.) 6
|
|
|
|
1998-02-12
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Valea Crucii, 6, ap.(of.) 233
|
|
|
|
1998-03-18
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Sarmizegetusa, 12, ap.(of.) 606
|
|
|
|
1998-04-22
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Dacia bd., 53, ap.(of.) 223
|
|
|
|
2004-09-27 - 2011-07-19
Rîşcani, Branişte
|
|
|
|
1998-09-17
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Dacia bd., 5, ap.(of.) 188
|
|
|
|
1998-09-24
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Traian bd., 23/1, ap.(of.) 356
|
|
|
|
1998-10-28
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Independenţei, 30/2, ap.(of.) 56
|
|
|
|
1999-05-04
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Trandafirilor, 29/1, ap.(of.) 73
|
|
|
|
1999-05-31
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Valea Crucii, 22, ap.(of.) 147
|
|
|
|
1999-09-15
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Murafa Simion, 44
|
|
|
|
2008-12-09 - 2020-01-30
Anenii Noi, Floreni, str. Dacilor, 38
|
|
|
|
2013-05-29 - 2018-01-31
Cahul, Cîşliţa-Prut
|
|
|
|
2007-08-23
mun. Chişinău, sec. Ciocana, str. Mircea cel Bătrân bd., 12, ap.(of.) 103
|
|
|
|
1993-01-21
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Ştefan cel Mare şi Sfânt bd., 169
|
|
|
|
1995-09-05 - 2021-09-15
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Traian bd., 14/4, ap.(of.) 30
|
|
|
|
2012-02-16 - 2020-09-29
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Melestiu, 26/10, ap.(of.) 65
|
|
|
|
2007-12-28 - 2015-12-22
mun. Chişinău, sec. Ciocana, str. Ginta Latină, 19/1, ap.(of.) 24
|
|
|
|
2007-12-06 - 2019-11-08
mun. Chişinău, sec. Centru, str. Drumul Viilor, 41, ap.(of.) 26
|
|
|
|
2004-05-14 - 2017-12-05
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Calea Ieşilor, 23, ap.(of.) 80
|
|
|
|
2004-09-21 - 2019-11-08
Bălţi, str. Larisa bd., 10, ap.(of.) 24
|
|
|
|
2010-04-22 - 2019-11-08
Bălţi, str. Viteazul Mihai, 52, ap.(of.) 3
|
|
|
|
2010-04-30 - 2017-10-03
UTA Găgăuzia, Comrat, str. Mareşalului Malinovski, 5
|
|
|
|
1997-08-13
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Calea Ieşilor, 14
|
|
|
|
1997-09-12
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Calea Ieşilor, 15, ap.(of.) 17
|
|
|
|
2008-10-20 - 2019-11-11
mun. Chişinău, sec. Centru, str. Crihan Anton, 44
|
|
|
|
1998-06-29
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Ştefan cel Mare şi Sfânt bd., 184 B
|
|
|
|
1998-11-27
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Coca E., 24, ap.(of.) 19
|
|
|
|
2002-04-29 - 2018-05-29
Cantemir, Cociulia
|
|