|
|
1995-11-23
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Costin Nicolae H., 61/2, ap.(of.) 17
|
|
|
|
1995-12-27
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Alba-Iulia, 5, ap.(of.) 62
|
|
|
|
1996-05-28
mun. Chişinău, Vatra, str. Plopilor, 11
|
|
|
|
1996-11-13
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Marinescu Al., 11/2, ap.(of.) 14
|
|
|
|
1998-04-29 - 2021-10-26
Ialoveni, Bardar
|
|
|
|
1997-03-25
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Tofan Gheorghe, 4, ap.(of.) 23
|
|
|
|
1997-06-25
mun. Chişinău, Vatra, str. Eminescu Mihai, 25/1, ap.(of.) 4
|
|
|
|
1997-07-25
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Deleanu Liviu, 5/4, ap.(of.) 13
|
|
|
|
1997-10-02 - 2021-09-21
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Zelinski N., 35, ap.(of.) 70
|
|
|
|
1997-10-21
mun. Chişinău, Vatra, str. Pruncul Ion, 2
|
|
|
|
1997-12-22
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Coca E., 15, ap.(of.) 502
|
|
|
|
1998-03-11
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Doina şi Ion, 11/1 O
|
|
|
|
1997-03-04
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Calea Ieşilor, 69/V, ap.(of.) 1
|
|
|
|
2000-02-22
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Ţarinei, 27
|
|
|
|
2000-09-05
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Alba-Iulia, 206/1, ap.(of.) 3
|
|
|
|
1997-09-29
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Sfatul Ţării, 32, ap.(of.) 10
|
|
|
|
2001-08-28
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Coca E., 17, ap.(of.) 65
|
|
|
|
1998-01-21
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Buiucani, 3, ap.(of.) 46
|
|
|
|
2002-01-09 - 2020-09-29
mun. Chişinău, sec. Ciocana, str. Uzinelor, 170/B, ap.(of.) 1
|
|
|
|
1998-02-20
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Ghibu Onisifor, 5, ap.(of.) 86
|
|
|
|
1998-03-09
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Marinescu Al., 13, ap.(of.) 5
|
|
|
|
2003-12-08 - 2021-02-02
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Petricani, 21/4
|
|
|
|
1998-06-04
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Alexandrescu Grigore, 17/1, ap.(of.) 39
|
|
|
|
1998-06-11
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Doina şi Ion Aldea-Teodorovici, 11/1, ap.(of.) 12
|
|
|
|
1998-06-11
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Balcani şos., 4, ap.(of.) 59
|
|
|
|
1998-06-16
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Paris, 40, ap.(of.) 64
|
|
|
|
1998-06-22
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Suceviţa, 43, ap.(of.) 74/2
|
|
|
|
1998-10-22
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Lazo S., 6, ap.(of.) 6
|
|
|
|
1999-05-04 - 2001-10-31
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Deleanu Liviu, 7/1, ap.(of.) 3
|
|
|
|
2013-04-04 - 2021-09-21
Dubăsari, Doroţcaia
|
|
|
|
1999-12-07 - 2011-06-30
Donduşeni, Corbu
|
|
|
|
2012-10-04 - 2020-09-24
Glodeni, str. Zgîrcea Vasile, 6, ap.(of.) 44
|
|
|
|
2001-02-19
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Ghioceilor, 1
|
|
|
|
2001-08-22
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Coca E., 17, ap.(of.) 26
|
|
|
|
2001-08-30
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Creangă Ion, 22/2, ap.(of.) 19
|
|