|
|
2009-03-03 - 2023-02-22
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Zelinski N., 32/6, ap.(of.) 33
|
|
|
|
2009-03-14 - 2023-02-22
Ialoveni, str. Moldova, 17
|
|
|
|
2001-12-25
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Ceucari, 10, ap.(of.) 50
|
|
|
|
1992-10-28
Cahul, str. Prospectul Republicii, 17
|
|
|
|
1997-06-13 - 2023-02-22
UTA Găgăuzia, Vulcăneşti, str. Luxemburg Roza, 2
|
|
|
|
1997-10-07
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Costin Miron, 7
|
|
|
|
2008-02-21 - 2023-02-23
mun. Chişinău, sec. Centru, str. Mitropolit Varlaam, 63
|
|
|
|
2011-01-31
Ialoveni, str. Basarabia, 2
|
|
|
|
1997-05-15 - 2023-02-27
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Marinescu Al., 13, ap.(of.) 6
|
|
|
|
2015-01-30 - 2023-05-25
mun. Chişinău, Codru, str. Grenoble, 128/E
|
|
|
|
2010-05-11 - 2023-02-27
mun. Chişinău, Sîngera, str. Mateevici A., 31
|
|
|
|
2010-07-23 - 2023-02-27
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Dacia bd., 51, ap.(of.) 1
|
|
|
|
2009-10-29
mun. Chişinău, sec. Centru, str. Porumbiţei, 2/1
|
|
|
|
1998-02-27
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Petricani, 19/5
|
|
|
|
2010-07-13
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Munceşti şos., 121
|
|
|
|
2011-04-12
mun. Chişinău, sec. Ciocana, str. Vieru Igor, 15, ap.(of.) 59
|
|
|
|
2011-01-26 - 2023-03-01
Dubăsari, Cocieri, str. Gorkii, 3
|
|
|
|
2012-08-16
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Decebal bd., 76, ap.(of.) 1013
|
|
|
|
2011-03-22
mun. Chişinău, sec. Ciocana, str. Budeşti, 1
|
|
|
|
1998-10-21
Tiraspol, str. Kahovskaia, 6, ap.(of.) 9
|
|
|
|
2014-01-21 - 2023-07-28
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Feredeului, 12
|
|
|
|
2000-02-15
mun. Chişinău, sec. Ciocana, str. Russo Alecu, 55/5, ap.(of.) 22
|
|
|
|
2011-12-07
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Deleanu Liviu, 5/Z, ap.(of.) 412
|
|
|
|
2010-06-09
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Râşcanu Dumitru, 8, ap.(of.) 14
|
|
|
|
2001-09-14
Căuşeni, str. Tighina şos., 10
|
|
|
|
2014-10-24
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Mitropolit Dosoftei, 126
|
|
|
|
1995-05-18 - 2023-03-24
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Studenţilor, 10/1, ap.(of.) 54
|
|
|
|
1997-08-26 - 2023-03-09
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Doga Andrei, 41/2, ap.(of.) 3
|
|
|
|
2007-04-17
mun. Chişinău, Stăuceni, str. Dumbravei, 21
|
|
|
|
2003-07-31
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Moscova bd., 1/3, ap.(of.) 127
|
|
|
|
2003-06-27
mun. Chişinău, sec. Ciocana, str. Vieru Igor, 4, ap.(of.) 25
|
|
|
|
2003-11-06
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Cuza-Vodă bd., 27/2, ap.(of.) 52
|
|
|
|
2008-10-10 - 2023-08-28
mun. Chişinău, sec. Ciocana, str. Voluntarilor, 12/1, ap.(of.) 86
|
|
|
|
2014-03-31
mun. Chişinău, sec. Ciocana, str. Transnistria, 5/1
|
|
|
|
1997-06-24
mun. Chişinău, Vadul lui Vodă, str. Onica Anton, 29
|
|