|
|
2005-02-23
Orhei, str. Troşceanschi Fiodor, 17/A
|
|
|
|
1994-02-15 - 2018-11-14
Nisporeni, str. Tînjeleşti, 5, ap.(of.) 2
|
|
|
|
1995-04-28 - 2014-01-03
Hînceşti, Drăguşenii Noi
|
|
|
|
2006-05-16
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Bănulescu-Bodoni G., 4, ap.(of.) 11
|
|
|
|
1995-01-10 - 2018-05-02
Bălţi, str. Konev Ivan, 13, ap.(of.) 9
|
|
|
|
1994-05-03 - 2018-11-14
Nisporeni, Iurceni
|
|
|
|
1992-12-17 - 2014-11-10
Străşeni, str. Alecsandri Vasile, 34/1
|
|
|
|
1995-05-11 - 2019-03-26
Ungheni, Petreşti
|
|
|
|
1996-06-19 - 2018-09-14
Ungheni, str. Eminescu Mihai, 28, ap.(of.) 67
|
|
|
|
2002-01-21
Călăraşi, Hirova
|
|
|
|
1997-03-27 - 2023-04-20
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Dimo N., 17/2, ap.(of.) 20
|
|
|
|
1993-06-30 - 2019-03-26
Ungheni, str. Crestiuc Ghenadie, 7/1, ap.(of.) 37
|
|
|
|
2006-05-17
Ialoveni, str. Alexandru cel Bun, 13, ap.(of.) 4
|
|
|
|
2006-05-22
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Costin Miron, 11/2, ap.(of.) 12
|
|
|
|
1994-07-29 - 2019-03-26
Ungheni, str. Naţională, 11
|
|
|
|
1995-03-29 - 2019-03-26
Ungheni, str. Decebal, 17, ap.(of.) 3
|
|
|
|
1992-11-23
Străşeni, str. 31 August 1989, 100
|
|
|
|
1996-08-23 - 2018-11-26
mun. Chişinău, sec. Centru, str. Asachi Gh., 37/2, ap.(of.) 3
|
|
|
|
2006-05-23
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Moscova bd., 21
|
|
|
|
1995-07-21 - 2016-07-05
Basarabeasca, str. Gării, 1, ap.(of.) 33
|
|
|
|
1994-11-25 - 2018-05-02
Cantemir, str. Gagarin Iu., 9, ap.(of.) 7
|
|
|
|
2006-05-12
mun. Chişinău, Ciorescu, str. Kogălniceanu Mihail, 1
|
|
|
|
2004-07-28
mun. Chişinău, Grătieşti, str. Ştefan cel Mare, 92
|
|
|
|
2006-05-25
mun. Chişinău, sec. Ciocana, str. Drăgan Maria, 3/A, ap.(of.) 27
|
|
|
|
1995-12-25 - 2017-06-13
UTA Găgăuzia, Comrat, str. Tretiacova, 99
|
|
|
|
2006-05-25
Anenii Noi, Varniţa, str. Cantemir D., 5a
|
|
|
|
1992-04-06
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Deleanu Liviu, 3, ap.(of.) 127
|
|
|
|
1992-12-24 - 2019-03-26
Ungheni, Chirileni
|
|
|
|
1997-11-19 - 2016-07-18
Orhei, str. Codreanca, 8
|
|
|
|
1993-07-23
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Podgorenilor, 91
|
|
|
|
2001-02-16 - 2022-08-09
Bălţi, str. Burebista, 17
|
|
|
|
1997-12-04
mun. Chişinău, Vatra, str. Pruncul Ion, 2
|
|
|
|
1993-09-14 - 2019-03-26
Ungheni, str. Crestiuc Ghenadie, 11, ap.(of.) 13
|
|
|
|
2006-06-01
mun. Chişinău, Durleşti, str. Gribov N., 39
|
|
|
|
2012-01-27 - 2020-11-03
mun. Chişinău, sec. Ciocana, str. Meşterul Manole, 9, ap.(of.) 8
|
|