|
|
2004-02-11 - 2020-03-03
mun. Chişinău, Durleşti, str. Gribov N., 4/1, ap.(of.) 43
|
|
|
|
1996-01-18 - 2020-03-03
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Zelinski N., 32/2, ap.(of.) 11
|
|
|
|
2004-03-29 - 2020-03-03
mun. Chişinău, Durleşti, str. Sadoveanu M., 74/A
|
|
|
|
1998-02-04 - 2020-05-15
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Pelivan Ion, 30/2, ap.(of.) 68
|
|
|
|
2005-05-06 - 2020-05-15
mun. Chişinău, sec. Centru, str. Ialoveni, 102/1, ap.(of.) 8
|
|
|
|
2008-07-15 - 2020-05-15
Criuleni, str. Ştefan cel Mare, 52, ap.(of.) 11
|
|
|
|
2004-10-05 - 2020-03-03
Străşeni, Micăuţi
|
|
|
|
2004-10-18 - 2020-03-03
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Dacia bd., 49/2, ap.(of.) 113
|
|
|
|
2004-12-13 - 2020-03-03
mun. Chişinău, Durleşti, str. Alecsandri Vasile, 27
|
|
|
|
2012-10-26 - 2024-05-03
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Mitropolit Dosoftei, 102, ap.(of.) 21
|
|
|
|
1995-02-20 - 2022-04-05
Ştefan Vodă, str. Mateevici A., 1, ap.(of.) 114
|
|
|
|
2010-11-24 - 2020-05-15
mun. Chişinău, Vadul lui Vodă, str. Cetatea Albă, 7
|
|
|
|
2011-01-06 - 2020-05-15
Străşeni, Codreanca
|
|
|
|
2004-05-26 - 2020-03-03
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Lupu Vasile, 19, ap.(of.) 26
|
|
|
|
2004-11-29 - 2020-05-15
Sîngerei, Rădoaia
|
|
|
|
2004-01-18
Soroca, str. Budde Feofania, 34/A
|
|
|
|
2008-05-19 - 2020-05-18
mun. Chişinău, sec. Ciocana, str. Zadnipru P., 21, ap.(of.) 56
|
|
|
|
1992-09-09 - 2024-04-04
Drochia, str. Armoniei, 21
|
|
|
|
2011-05-13 - 2020-05-18
Ialoveni, Suruceni
|
|
|
|
1993-01-31 - 2020-05-15
mun. Chişinău, sec. Centru, str. Ciuflea, 5, ap.(of.) 10
|
|
|
|
2011-05-25 - 2020-05-18
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Braniştii, 19, ap.(of.) 14
|
|
|
|
2011-06-01 - 2020-05-18
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Creangă Ion, 53/1, ap.(of.) 110
|
|
|
|
1992-12-29 - 2020-05-18
mun. Chişinău, sec. Centru, str. Tolstoi L., 63
|
|
|
|
1992-12-28 - 2020-05-18
mun. Chişinău, sec. Centru, str. Garofiţelor, 2/4, ap.(of.) 32
|
|
|
|
2006-08-28 - 2020-05-18
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Cantonului, 10, ap.(of.) 1A
|
|
|
|
2006-08-07 - 2020-05-18
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Ciobanu Ştefan, 4
|
|
|
|
2006-08-24 - 2020-05-18
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Alexandrescu Grigore, 13, ap.(of.) 51
|
|
|
|
2011-10-20 - 2020-05-18
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Crăsescu V., 93
|
|
|
|
1992-08-25 - 2020-05-18
mun. Chişinău, sec. Centru, str. Bucureşti, 60, ap.(of.) 10
|
|
|
|
2004-11-01 - 2020-05-18
Bălţi, str. Ştefan cel Mare, 3, ap.(of.) 82
|
|
|
|
1996-12-12 - 2020-05-18
Rezina, Saharna Nouă
|
|
|
|
2014-03-11 - 2020-05-18
Rezina, str. Trandafirilor, 6/3, ap.(of.) 36
|
|
|
|
1992-03-17 - 2020-04-14
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Basarab Matei, 7/5, ap.(of.) 22
|
|
|
|
1994-01-28
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Zelinski N., 15
|
|
|
|
1997-08-13 - 2020-05-19
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Lupu Vasile, 34, ap.(of.) 28
|
|