|
|
1995-12-27 - 2020-09-21
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Traian bd., 21/1, ap.(of.) 65
|
|
|
|
1994-02-04 - 2016-01-14
Şoldăneşti, str. Komarov Vl., 15
|
|
|
|
2014-04-16
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Calea Orheiului, 77, ap.(of.) 14
|
|
|
|
2014-04-15
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Dimo N., 29/3, ap.(of.) 104
|
|
|
|
2014-04-11
Bălţi, str. Libertăţii, 48
|
|
|
|
2003-04-30
mun. Chişinău, sec. Centru, str. Eminescu Mihai, 63, ap.(of.) 8
|
|
|
|
2011-10-26
UTA Găgăuzia, Comrat, str. Kalinin, 1, ap.(of.) 2
|
|
|
|
2011-12-19
UTA Găgăuzia, Vulcăneşti, str. Ananiev, 12
|
|
|
|
1997-05-06 - 2020-09-21
mun. Chişinău, sec. Ciocana, str. Ginta Latină, 5B, ap.(of.) 57
|
|
|
|
1997-05-08 - 2020-09-21
mun. Chişinău, sec. Ciocana, str. Milescu-Spătarul Nicolae, 1, ap.(of.) 100
|
|
|
|
1997-03-03
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Dimo Nicolae, 7/3, ap.(of.) 66
|
|
|
|
1997-05-15
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Calea Basarabiei, 34/1
|
|
|
|
2007-10-23
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Burebista, 42, ap.(of.) 120
|
|
|
|
2000-05-24 - 2019-05-21
mun. Chişinău, sec. Centru, str. Puşkin A., 12, ap.(of.) 6
|
|
|
|
2007-12-19
UTA Găgăuzia, Ceadîr-Lunga, str. Turghenev, 20
|
|
|
|
2005-05-12 - 2023-01-18
Ialoveni, str. Movilă Petru, 9
|
|
|
|
2002-09-19
mun. Chişinău, sec. Centru, str. Tighina, 49/3, ap.(of.) 23
|
|
|
|
1992-12-28 - 2023-08-21
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Lupu Vasile, 25
|
|
|
|
2005-10-25
Dubăsari, str. Lenin, 245, ap.(of.) 517
|
|
|
|
1994-09-21 - 2021-08-23
Criuleni, Cimişeni
|
|
|
|
1996-05-31 - 2005-03-31
Briceni, str. Frunze M., 44/1
|
|
|
|
2013-04-22
Ialoveni, Costeşti
|
|
|
|
2004-12-01
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Lupu Vasile, 59/1, ap.(of.) 28
|
|
|
|
2005-04-06
mun. Chişinău, Cricova, str. Minerilor, 17
|
|
|
|
2012-01-13
mun. Chişinău, Băcioi
|
|
|
|
2002-04-30 - 2017-03-01
Bălţi, str. Bulgară, 144, ap.(of.) 9
|
|
|
|
2012-01-16
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Dacia bd., 7/2, ap.(of.) 64
|
|
|
|
2007-05-28
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Paris, 34/2, ap.(of.) 48
|
|
|
|
2012-01-17
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Lupu Vasile, 59/2, ap.(of.) 33
|
|
|
|
2012-01-13 - 2012-05-11
mun. Chişinău, Bubuieci, str. Trandafirilor, 1
|
|
|
|
2012-01-12
Ialoveni, str. Sihastru Daniil, 2, ap.(of.) 26
|
|
|
|
2007-01-11 - 2020-01-28
mun. Chişinău, Truşeni, str. Meşterul Manole, 21
|
|
|
|
2003-12-24 - 2021-08-21
Cimişlia, str. Patria, 14/A
|
|
|
|
2012-01-23
mun. Chişinău, sec. Centru, str. Bernardazzi Alexandru, 49, ap.(of.) 1
|
|
|
|
2011-09-21 - 2021-01-14
UTA Găgăuzia, Comrat, str. Cotovschi, 84, ap.(of.) 2
|
|