|
|
2017-11-08
mun. Chişinău, Codru, str. Costiujeni, 12/7, ap.(of.) 3
|
|
|
|
2018-04-18
Cahul, str. Mateevici Alexei, 58
|
|
|
|
2018-08-03
mun. Chişinău, sec. Centru, str. Melestiu, 26/6, ap.(of.) 379
|
|
|
|
2018-06-11
Dubăsari, Doroţcaia
|
|
|
|
2016-06-16
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Albişoara, 82/6, ap.(of.) 4
|
|
|
|
2019-09-12
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Decebal bd., 99/G, ap.(of.) 14
|
|
|
|
2021-08-16
UTA Găgăuzia, Comrat, str. Frunze M., 49
|
|
|
|
2018-10-29
mun. Chişinău, Vatra, str. Plopilor, 49A
|
|
|
|
2019-09-13
mun. Chişinău, sec. Centru, str. Academician Natalia Gheorghiu, 30, ap.(of.) 165
|
|
|
|
2024-07-16
mun. Chişinău, sec. Ciocana, str. Vieru Igor, 2/4, ap.(of.) 63
|
|
|
|
2010-10-06
Orhei, Trebujeni
|
|
|
|
2021-08-19 - 2023-06-06
Cahul, Roşu, str. Independenţei, 21
|
|
|
|
1993-03-30 - 2020-04-15
Orhei, str. Bălcescu N., 25
|
|
|
|
2017-11-08
Bălţi, str. Larisa bd., 6, ap.(of.) 50
|
|
|
|
2021-08-26
Cahul, Frumuşica
|
|
|
|
2016-11-15
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Hipodromului, 5, ap.(of.) 6
|
|
|
|
2019-09-16
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Drumul Taberei, 60, ap.(of.) 3
|
|
|
|
2021-08-26
Cantemir, Cania
|
|
|
|
2017-01-24
Bălţi, str. Kolesov Ivan, 19/A, ap.(of.) 29
|
|
|
|
2021-08-26
UTA Găgăuzia, Vulcăneşti, str. Kirov, 27
|
|
|
|
2021-08-26
Cahul, Pelinei
|
|
|
|
2021-09-06
Cahul, str. Doinelor, 21
|
|
|
|
2021-09-03
Cahul, Zîrneşti
|
|
|
|
2021-09-08 - 2021-11-26
Taraclia, Albota de Sus
|
|
|
|
2016-09-07 - 2018-01-10
Donduşeni, str. Feroviarilor, 48
|
|
|
|
1995-01-31
Cantemir, Ciobalaccia
|
|
|
|
2018-12-12
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Zelinski Nicolai, 8, ap.(of.) 21
|
|
|
|
2020-03-03
Rezina, str. Păcii, 57, ap.(of.) 4
|
|
|
|
2017-03-03 - 2020-10-16
mun. Chişinău, sec. Centru, str. Cupcea V., 42
|
|
|
|
2019-09-16
Donduşeni, Sudarca
|
|
|
|
2018-02-06
Glodeni, Fundurii Vechi
|
|
|
|
2017-02-16
Taraclia, str. Raevski, 10
|
|
|
|
2018-12-12
mun. Chişinău, sec. Ciocana, str. Vieru Igor, 11, ap.(of.) 29
|
|
|
|
2017-11-09
mun. Chişinău, sec. Centru, str. Negruzzi Constantin bd., 1, ap.(of.) 55
|
|
|
|
2016-03-01 - 2018-12-12
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Alba-Iulia, 75/3, ap.(of.) 19
|
|