|
|
2001-11-07 - 2010-05-19
Orhei, str. Frunze str-la, 34
|
|
|
|
1999-08-26 - 2015-11-27
Cahul, Moscovei
|
|
|
|
2000-05-30 - 2015-03-25
Ungheni, Gherman
|
|
|
|
1996-09-12 - 2010-06-02
Cahul, str. Negruzzi Constantin bd., 119/40
|
|
|
|
1993-05-13
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Mitropolit Dosoftei, 156
|
|
|
|
1999-05-11 - 2016-02-04
Cahul, str. Şcheia şos., 16A
|
|
|
|
1993-06-29 - 2016-03-09
Cantemir, Cania, str. Alecsandri V., 7
|
|
|
|
2007-02-01 - 2024-09-09
Cahul, str. Viteazul Mihai, 43, ap.(of.) 60
|
|
|
|
2015-02-05
Briceni, Tabani
|
|
|
|
2013-01-09
Floreşti, str. Gării, 4, ap.(of.) 2
|
|
|
|
2003-10-13
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Dacia bd., 30/1, ap.(of.) 7
|
|
|
|
2001-09-10
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Mateevici A., 64, ap.(of.) 9
|
|
|
|
2005-08-26
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Albişoara, 80/2, ap.(of.) 28
|
|
|
|
1998-10-27 - 2017-02-21
Ungheni, str. Naţională, 14
|
|
|
|
2007-02-01 - 2019-01-04
Glodeni, Sturzovca
|
|
|
|
1997-10-08 - 2017-04-03
Drochia, str. Sorocii şos., 44, ap.(of.) 7
|
|
|
|
2001-01-10
mun. Chişinău, sec. Ciocana, str. Zadnipru P., 9, ap.(of.) 8
|
|
|
|
2002-08-29
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Vieru Grigore bd., 14, ap.(of.) 17
|
|
|
|
2002-03-26
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Cuza-Vodă bd., 31, ap.(of.) 12
|
|
|
|
2007-06-05 - 2021-03-15
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Albişoara, 70, ap.(of.) 14
|
|
|
|
2001-10-03 - 2009-07-15
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Alba-Iulia, 5, ap.(of.) 81
|
|
|
|
2003-12-18
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Independenţei, 20/2, ap.(of.) 33
|
|
|
|
2001-08-02
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Sarmizegetusa, 37/2, ap.(of.) 28
|
|
|
|
2001-05-24
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Ismail, 100/2, ap.(of.) 85
|
|
|
|
2007-03-26 - 2021-03-15
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Russo Alecu, 1, ap.(of.) 704
|
|
|
|
2004-03-19 - 2021-03-15
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Florilor, 8/2, ap.(of.) 24
|
|
|
|
1998-02-06
mun. Chişinău, Stăuceni, str. Studenţilor, 5
|
|
|
|
1999-09-22 - 2018-06-07
Cahul, str. Ştefan cel Mare, 11, ap.(of.) 33
|
|
|
|
2011-04-14 - 2020-02-17
Făleşti, Călugăr
|
|
|
|
1998-04-02 - 2005-06-29
Cimişlia, str. Eminescu Mihai, 4
|
|
|
|
1994-07-27
Cimişlia, str. Libertăţii, 16
|
|
|
|
1995-02-04
Cimişlia, str. Barbu Lăutaru, 5
|
|
|
|
1995-12-20
Cimişlia, str. Alecsandri Vasile, 23
|
|
|
|
1996-04-25
Cimişlia, str. Cehov, 12/A
|
|
|
|
2005-01-24 - 2020-11-26
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Coroban Vasile, 47/2, ap.(of.) 27
|
|