|
|
2001-09-24 - 2021-10-27
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Decebal bd., 6/2, ap.(of.) 79
|
|
|
|
1997-01-17 - 2020-11-24
mun. Chişinău, sec. Centru, str. Bernardazzi Alessandro, 8, ap.(of.) 11
|
|
|
|
2011-08-02
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Pădurii, 6/3
|
|
|
|
2009-02-12 - 2015-11-11
mun. Chişinău, sec. Centru, str. Mioriţa, 5/3, ap.(of.) 63
|
|
|
|
2009-06-12 - 2013-12-10
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Doga Andrei, 28, ap.(of.) 106
|
|
|
|
2009-09-04 - 2014-01-27
mun. Chişinău, Cricova, str. Chişinăului, 97, ap.(of.) 4
|
|
|
|
2009-11-10 - 2014-11-12
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Calea Orheiului, 103/2, ap.(of.) 53
|
|
|
|
2009-12-10 - 2015-11-27
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Traian bd., 20, ap.(of.) 117
|
|
|
|
2009-12-21 - 2017-01-26
mun. Chişinău, sec. Centru, str. Kaczynski Lech, 6/4, ap.(of.) 20
|
|
|
|
2009-08-19 - 2013-02-18
Bălţi, str. 31 August, 123, ap.(of.) 1
|
|
|
|
2009-02-02 - 2015-03-10
mun. Chişinău, sec. Centru, str. Pietrarilor, 8/1, ap.(of.) 1
|
|
|
|
2009-03-24 - 2016-01-14
Cahul, Văleni
|
|
|
|
2001-10-10
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Pădurii, 17
|
|
|
|
2009-06-23 - 2013-11-13
Orhei, Voroteţ
|
|
|
|
2009-05-26 - 2017-02-27
Floreşti, str. Costin Miron, 38
|
|
|
|
2009-11-16 - 2015-04-10
Soroca, Rubleniţa
|
|
|
|
2015-02-19 - 2020-02-17
mun. Chişinău, sec. Centru, str. Asachi Gh., 71/7, ap.(of.) 88
|
|
|
|
2002-03-05 - 2015-06-11
Ungheni, str. Ţepeş Vlad, 2, ap.(of.) 2
|
|
|
|
2010-01-15 - 2013-10-25
mun. Chişinău, sec. Centru, str. Vlaicu Pârcălab, 63
|
|
|
|
2010-03-26 - 2014-05-12
mun. Chişinău, sec. Ciocana, str. Mircea cel Bătrân bd., 15, ap.(of.) 39
|
|
|
|
2010-03-23 - 2013-03-29
Criuleni, str. Izvoarelor, 33/A
|
|
|
|
2010-06-23 - 2013-10-28
Anenii Noi, Varniţa, str. Tighina, 64
|
|
|
|
1993-06-29 - 2020-11-19
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Cuza-Vodă bd., 45, ap.(of.) 27
|
|
|
|
2010-06-29 - 2014-02-14
Rîşcani, Mihăileni
|
|
|
|
2010-01-21 - 2014-11-14
Cantemir, Cociulia
|
|
|
|
2010-04-06 - 2014-08-04
Cahul, Luceşti
|
|
|
|
2010-04-30 - 2016-11-25
Cantemir, Hănăseni
|
|
|
|
1996-06-18 - 2016-03-22
Taraclia, str. Mira, 8 A, ap.(of.) 16
|
|
|
|
2010-10-27 - 2016-05-30
Cantemir, Tartaul
|
|
|
|
2010-11-03 - 2015-07-15
Cantemir, Cociulia
|
|
|
|
2010-11-04 - 2015-08-06
Cahul, str. Alecsandri Vasile, 9
|
|
|
|
2011-01-04 - 2013-02-19
Cahul, str. Frunze M., 51/Б
|
|
|
|
2010-09-21
Ungheni, str. Rareş Petru, 55
|
|
|
|
2010-11-12 - 2015-01-29
UTA Găgăuzia, Comrat, str. Lazo S., 33, ap.(of.) 24
|
|
|
|
2011-02-16 - 2014-12-17
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Calea Ieşilor, 49/A, ap.(of.) 1
|
|