|
|
2011-05-25 - 2017-08-28
Cahul, Roşu
|
|
|
|
1995-12-08 - 2000-04-18
mun. Chişinău, sec. Centru, str. Tighina, 42, ap.(of.) 213
|
|
|
|
2013-01-21
mun. Chişinău, sec. Ciocana, str. Drăgan Maria, 2/1/A, ap.(of.) 1
|
|
|
|
2013-12-13
Bălţi, str. Glavan Boris, 23, ap.(of.) 43
|
|
|
|
1999-01-25
mun. Chişinău, sec. Ciocana, str. Mircea cel Bătrân bd., 16, ap.(of.) 82
|
|
|
|
2013-12-18
mun. Chişinău, sec. Centru, str. Testemiţeanu N., 18
|
|
|
|
1996-04-03 - 2020-09-08
Rezina, str. Lomonosov M., 143
|
|
|
|
1992-11-27 - 2020-10-02
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Aerodromului, 7/2, ap.(of.) 10
|
|
|
|
2010-03-09
mun. Chişinău, sec. Centru, str. Puşkin A., 22, ap.(of.) 337
|
|
|
|
2002-02-14
Bălţi, str. Viteazul Mihai
|
|
|
|
2009-10-23
Soroca, str. Stroescu V., 26, ap.(of.) 27
|
|
|
|
2011-06-16 - 2017-12-04
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Acad. Saharov, 11, ap.(of.) CёM
|
|
|
|
2014-03-26
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Titulescu Nicolae, 49, ap.(of.) 36
|
|
|
|
2008-07-22
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Madan Gheorghe, 87/3, ap.(of.) 4
|
|
|
|
2014-05-29
Soroca, Egoreni
|
|
|
|
1996-07-16
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Cahulului, 21, ap.(of.) 4
|
|
|
|
2009-12-17 - 2019-05-22
Edineţ, str. Independenţei, 84, ap.(of.) 20
|
|
|
|
1997-05-20
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Grădinilor, 58, ap.(of.) 15
|
|
|
|
1998-02-27 - 2022-01-28
Căuşeni, str. Bogdan-Vodă, 35
|
|
|
|
1997-08-12
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Cojocarilor, 13, ap.(of.) 1
|
|
|
|
2010-11-16
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Badiu Vasile, 8, ap.(of.) 19
|
|
|
|
1997-11-18
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Doga Andrei, 39, ap.(of.) 40
|
|
|
|
1997-12-02
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Damian L., 8
|
|
|
|
2000-03-01
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Ismail, 100/2, ap.(of.) 58
|
|
|
|
1997-03-04
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Albişoara, 78/1, ap.(of.) 105
|
|
|
|
2005-08-15 - 2019-11-06
Bălţi, str. Testemiţeanu N., 15
|
|
|
|
2001-04-26
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Florilor, 16/2, ap.(of.) 19
|
|
|
|
1998-01-27
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Bogdan-Voievod, 8/6, ap.(of.) 83
|
|
|
|
2000-01-21 - 2018-05-26
Cahul, str. Asachi Gh., 12
|
|
|
|
1998-02-18 - 2018-05-26
Cahul, str. Stroescu V., 21
|
|
|
|
1994-10-27 - 2018-05-26
Cahul, str. Caragiale Ion Luca, 89
|
|
|
|
1998-10-27
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Ţirilson Rabbi, 2, ap.(of.) 2
|
|
|
|
1998-01-16
mun. Chişinău, sec. Centru, str. Bulgară, 107, ap.(of.) 14
|
|
|
|
1999-01-26
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Dimo N., 17/1, ap.(of.) 3
|
|
|
|
1999-03-16
mun. Chişinău, sec. Ciocana, str. Russo Alecu, 55/3, ap.(of.) 19
|
|