|
|
2001-10-05 - 2007-12-29
mun. Chişinău, sec. Ciocana, str. Russo Alecu, 61/4, ap.(of.) 39
|
|
|
|
2001-02-19 - 2019-04-16
Ungheni, Valea Mare
|
|
|
|
1993-06-25
Anenii Noi, str. Soltîs Ion, 22
|
|
|
|
1992-08-10 - 2024-08-10
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Lupu Vasile, 46/R, ap.(of.) 4
|
|
|
|
2001-03-16 - 2002-09-30
mun. Chişinău, sec. Ciocana, str. Sadoveanu M., 8/2, ap.(of.) 82
|
|
|
|
1995-07-21 - 2017-09-13
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Pandurilor, 19, ap.(of.) 20
|
|
|
|
1995-10-12
Anenii Noi, Cobusca Veche
|
|
|
|
1994-11-15 - 2017-09-13
mun. Chişinău, sec. Centru, str. Mioriţa, 1A
|
|
|
|
2013-10-14
Ialoveni, Ruseştii Noi
|
|
|
|
2011-04-18
Glodeni, str. 300 ani Glodeni, 87, ap.(of.) 2
|
|
|
|
1999-02-22 - 2021-10-29
UTA Găgăuzia, Comrat, str. Lenin, 159
|
|
|
|
2001-07-11
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Dacia bd., 49/14, ap.(of.) 68
|
|
|
|
1994-09-21
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Tănase Constantin, 9
|
|
|
|
2014-07-16
mun. Chişinău, sec. Centru, str. Asachi Gheorghe, 71/4, ap.(of.) CĂMIN
|
|
|
|
2009-02-03 - 2021-02-04
mun. Chişinău, sec. Ciocana, str. Transnistria, 22
|
|
|
|
2004-03-15
mun. Chişinău, sec. Ciocana, str. Milescu-Spătarul Nicolae, 19/7
|
|
|
|
1993-03-25 - 2001-08-08
Bălţi, str. Bulgară, 75, ap.(of.) 49
|
|
|
|
1993-08-20 - 2002-07-01
Cahul, str. Viteazul Mihai, 1
|
|
|
|
2014-10-29
mun. Chişinău, sec. Ciocana, str. Milescu-Spătarul Nicolae, 19/1, ap.(of.) 48
|
|
|
|
2007-04-04 - 2009-02-09
mun. Chişinău, sec. Centru, str. Bulgară, 11, ap.(of.) 5
|
|
|
|
1993-03-04 - 1998-11-04
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Albişoara, 76/7, ap.(of.) 42
|
|
|
|
2007-06-07
Cahul, str. Spirin V., 100, ap.(of.) 73
|
|
|
|
2014-10-30
mun. Chişinău, sec. Ciocana, str. Russo Alecu, 55/1, ap.(of.) 127
|
|
|
|
1993-07-09 - 2017-09-13
Ştefan Vodă, str. Florilor, 59
|
|
|
|
1993-12-14 - 2017-09-13
Ştefan Vodă, Ermoclia
|
|
|
|
2013-02-04
Soroca, str. Serii str-la, 23
|
|
|
|
2006-03-27
Edineţ, str. Şoseaua Bucovina, 25/7, ap.(of.) 10
|
|
|
|
2008-02-29 - 2008-12-11
mun. Chişinău, Bubuieci, str. 27 August, 21/A
|
|
|
|
2014-10-31
Ocniţa
|
|
|
|
2004-03-17 - 2008-08-19
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Florilor, 2/2, ap.(of.) CĂM
|
|
|
|
1997-01-24 - 2024-08-10
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Costin Nicolae, 59, ap.(of.) 214
|
|
|
|
1995-02-09 - 2001-08-28
UTA Găgăuzia, Vulcăneşti, str. Rumeanţev P., 4/12
|
|
|
|
2010-06-30
mun. Chişinău, Stăuceni, str. Trandafirilor, 57, ap.(of.) 6
|
|
|
|
2014-01-16
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Costin Nicolae H., 65/3, ap.(of.) 281
|
|
|
|
1996-01-16 - 2000-08-29
UTA Găgăuzia, Vulcăneşti, str. Korolenko, 1
|
|