|
|
1993-04-09 - 2015-11-09
Orhei, str. Troşceanschi Fiodor, 30
|
|
|
|
1995-11-24 - 2022-03-29
Ialoveni, str. Coşbuc G., 27
|
|
|
|
1996-08-02 - 2024-04-20
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Zelinski Nicolai, 36/3, ap.(of.) 44
|
|
|
|
1996-08-12 - 2024-04-20
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Sarmizegetusa, 18/4, ap.(of.) 76
|
|
|
|
2011-06-07 - 2019-12-24
Străşeni, str. Eminescu M. bd., 6
|
|
|
|
2002-04-17 - 2020-12-01
UTA Găgăuzia, Tomai, str. Voroşilov, 5
|
|
|
|
1996-10-01 - 2024-04-20
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Dacia bd., 44/2, ap.(of.) 114
|
|
|
|
2009-06-11 - 2022-10-11
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Doina şi Ion Aldea-Teodorovici, 11/2, ap.(of.) 44
|
|
|
|
1995-04-20 - 2019-12-26
Străşeni, Vorniceni
|
|
|
|
1995-09-25
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Vişinilor, 22
|
|
|
|
2004-04-29 - 2021-03-22
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Pajurii, 5, ap.(of.) 34
|
|
|
|
2011-02-02 - 2019-12-30
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Arbore Zamfir str-la, 15
|
|
|
|
2001-04-26 - 2019-12-30
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Creangă Ion, 13, ap.(of.) 3
|
|
|
|
2013-04-08 - 2019-12-30
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Alexandrescu Grigore, 15, ap.(of.) 20
|
|
|
|
2008-07-18 - 2021-03-24
Hînceşti, Buţeni
|
|
|
|
1994-12-09
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Deleanu Liviu, 3/3, ap.(of.) 97
|
|
|
|
2014-07-15 - 2020-05-12
Rezina, Ciorna, str. Cantemir D., 16
|
|
|
|
2014-07-17 - 2019-12-31
Floreşti, str. Ştefan cel Mare, 59, ap.(of.) 24
|
|
|
|
2000-05-04 - 2019-12-31
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Bălcescu N., 20
|
|
|
|
1997-09-29 - 2004-08-02
Ocniţa, Otaci, str. Şevcenko T., 12
|
|
|
|
1994-11-17 - 2024-04-20
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Sfîntul Pavel, 13, ap.(of.) 12
|
|
|
|
2008-12-05 - 2020-05-13
Bălţi, str. Locomotivelor, 3/A
|
|
|
|
2000-02-25
Cimişlia, str. Cibotari Maria, 23
|
|
|
|
1995-11-22 - 2021-03-25
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Dimo N., 18, ap.(of.) 36
|
|
|
|
2007-10-26 - 2020-01-02
Donduşeni, str. Independenţei, 13/2, ap.(of.) 26
|
|
|
|
2002-10-21 - 2015-12-02
Orhei, Jora de Sus
|
|
|
|
1994-03-03
Anenii Noi, Speia
|
|
|
|
2000-07-21 - 2020-02-27
Sîngerei, Dobrogea Veche
|
|
|
|
1994-11-23
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Deleanu Liviu, 5/1, ap.(of.) 36
|
|
|
|
2008-06-20 - 2020-05-14
mun. Chişinău, sec. Ciocana, str. Sadoveanu M., 2/5, ap.(of.) 54
|
|
|
|
2009-09-07 - 2020-05-14
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Unirii Principatelor piaţa, 1, ap.(of.) 223
|
|
|
|
1992-10-13 - 2020-01-11
mun. Chişinău, sec. Ciocana, str. Mircea cel Bătrân bd., 27/6
|
|
|
|
2010-03-24 - 2020-05-14
mun. Chişinău, sec. Ciocana, str. Drăgan Maria, 22/1, ap.(of.) 67
|
|
|
|
2010-06-11 - 2020-05-14
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Ismail, 102/4, ap.(of.) 97
|
|
|
|
2010-07-16 - 2020-05-14
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Ismail, 108, ap.(of.) 73
|
|